Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2020 at 06:02:02 (UTC).

Donald Bess v. Lorie Davis, Director

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Donald Bess filed a Prisoner - Death Penalty lawsuit against Lorie Davis, Director. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70006

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Death Penalty

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

DONALD ANDREW BESS

Respondent / Appellee

LORIE DAVIS, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Jeremy Schepers

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

525 S. Griffin Street

Dallas, TX 75202

David C. Currie Esq.

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

525 S. Griffin Street

Dallas, TX 75202

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Woodson Erich Dryden Esq.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Donald Andrew Bess to extend time to comply with COA requirements until 08/24/2020 [9329595-2]. Date of service: 06/08/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Currie, Schepers; Attorney for Appellee: Dryden [20-70006] (Jeremy Schepers ) [Entered: 06/08/2020 12:28 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9323857-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:53 AM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323266-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Donald Andrew Bess. [9323266-1] [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 05/29/2020 02:05 PM]

Open Document

LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 06/24/2020 for Appellant Donald Andrew Bess. Brief in Support due on 06/24/2020 for Appellant Donald Andrew Bess [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:53 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70006] (David C. Currie ) [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeremy Schepers for Mr. Donald Andrew Bess for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70006] (Jeremy Schepers ) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:15 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9302006-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [20-70006] #67 Motion to Alter Judg pending in dc (MRW) [Entered: 04/28/2020 08:27 AM]

Open Document

DEATH PENALTY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Donald Andrew Bess [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:00 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER granting Motion to extend time to comply with COA requirements filed by Appellant Mr. Donald Andrew Bess [ # 9329595-2 ] Motion due deadline updated to 08/24/2020 for Appellant Donald Andrew Bess. Brief in Support deadline updated to 08/24/2020 for Appellant Donald Andrew Bess [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 06/18/2020 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Donald Andrew Bess to extend time to comply with COA requirements until 08/24/2020 [9329595-2]. Date of service: 06/08/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Currie, Schepers; Attorney for Appellee: Dryden [20-70006] (Jeremy Schepers ) [Entered: 06/08/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:16-CV-1150. Electronic ROA due on 06/16/2020. [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9323857-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323266-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Donald Andrew Bess. [9323266-1] [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 05/29/2020 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 06/24/2020 for Appellant Donald Andrew Bess. Brief in Support due on 06/24/2020 for Appellant Donald Andrew Bess [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David C. Currie for party(s) Appellant Donald Andrew Bess, in case 20-70006 [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 05/01/2020 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:16-CV-1150. Electronic ROA due on 05/15/2020. [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jeremy Schepers for Appellant Donald Andrew Bess in 20-70006 [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketDISTRICT COURT ORDER of 04/28/2020 denying motion to alter or amend judgment [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70006] (David C. Currie ) [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeremy Schepers for Mr. Donald Andrew Bess for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70006] (Jeremy Schepers ) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9302006-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [20-70006] #67 Motion to Alter Judg pending in dc (MRW) [Entered: 04/28/2020 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEATH PENALTY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Donald Andrew Bess [20-70006] (MRW) [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LORIE DAVIS, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer W Erich Dryden(Designation Retained)