This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2019 at 06:10:41 (UTC).

Don Higginson v. Xavier Becerra, et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Don Higginson filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Xavier Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55275

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

CALIFORNIA LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS

XAVIER FLORES

JACQUELINE CONTRERAS

JUDY KI

HIRAM SOTO

Defendant / Appellees

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

CITY OF POWAY

Plaintiff / Appellant

DON HIGGINSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicole Ochi

Attorney at Asian Americans Advancing Justice- Los Angeles

1145 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Julia Gomez Hernandez

Attorney at Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund

634 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Deanna Kitamura Esquire

Attorney at Asian Americans Advancing Justice- Los Angeles

1145 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Denise Hulett Esquire

Attorney at Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund

1512 14Th Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Tanya Gabrielle Pellegrini

Attorney at Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund

1512 14Th Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Winifred V. Kao

Attorney at Asian Law Caucus

55 Columbus Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jonathan Stein

Attorney at Asian Law Caucus

55 Columbus Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94111

Molly Peach Matter

Attorney at Amend Law LLC

P.O. Box 13203

Burton, WA 98013

Kip Hustace

Attorney at Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund

634 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Thomas Andrew Saenz Esquire

Attorney at Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund

634 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amie L. Medley

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Alan Brian Fenstermacher

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

611 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Bryan K. Weir

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC

3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22201

William Consovoy

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC

3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22201

Jeffrey Matthew Harris

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC

3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/18/2019. [11231747] [19-55275] (Medley, Amie) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:43 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Don Higginson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/18/2019. [11231387] [19-55275] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 03/18/2019 10:57 AM]

#21

(#21) Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN and MARY H. MURGUIA) Appellants motion to expedite the appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 4 ]) is denied. The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. The Clerk is ordered to calendar this case as soon as possible after briefing is complete but no later than January 1, 2020. [11246337] (JMR) [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:24 AM]

#4

(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellees California League of United Latin American Citizens, Jacqueline Contreras, Xavier Flores, Judy Ki and Hiram Soto response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/20/2019. [11235885] [19-55275] (Gomez Hernandez, Julia) [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:43 PM]

#16

(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellees California League of United Latin American Citizens, Jacqueline Contreras, Xavier Flores, Judy Ki and Hiram Soto response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/20/2019. [11235885] [19-55275] (Gomez Hernandez, Julia) [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:43 PM]

#17

(#17) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11237199] (CL) [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:50 AM]

#20

(#20) Filed (ECF) Appellant Don Higginson reply to response (motion to expedite case, , , ). Date of service: 03/26/2019. [11243205] [19-55275] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 03/26/2019 05:30 PM]

#18

(#18) Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/25/2019. [11241023] [19-55275] (Medley, Amie) [Entered: 03/25/2019 01:30 PM]

#19

(#19) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Poway response to motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/25/2019. [11241321] [19-55275] (Fenstermacher, Alan) [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:51 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#12

(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Poway Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/18/2019. [11232160] [19-55275] (Fenstermacher, Alan) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:33 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN and MARY H. MURGUIA) Appellants motion to expedite the appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 4 ]) is denied. The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. The Clerk is ordered to calendar this case as soon as possible after briefing is complete but no later than January 1, 2020. [11246337] (JMR) [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Filed (ECF) Appellant Don Higginson reply to response (motion to expedite case, , , ). Date of service: 03/26/2019. [11243205] [19-55275] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 03/26/2019 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Poway response to motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/25/2019. [11241321] [19-55275] (Fenstermacher, Alan) [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/25/2019. [11241023] [19-55275] (Medley, Amie) [Entered: 03/25/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11237199] (CL) [Entered: 03/21/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Filed (ECF) Appellees California League of United Latin American Citizens, Jacqueline Contreras, Xavier Flores, Judy Ki and Hiram Soto response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/20/2019. [11235885] [19-55275] (Gomez Hernandez, Julia) [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • (#15) Added attorney Molly Peach Matter for California League of United Latin American Citizens, Judy Ki, Xavier Flores, Hiram Soto and Jacqueline Contreras, in case 19-55275. [11234958] (QDL) [Entered: 03/20/2019 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • (#14) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Molly Peach Matter for Appellees California League of United Latin American Citizens, Jacqueline Contreras, Xavier Flores, Judy Ki and Hiram Soto. Date of service: 03/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11234855] [19-55275] (Matter, Molly) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#13) Added attorney Jeffrey Matthew Harris for Don Higginson, in case 19-55275. [11232341] (QDL) [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Filed (ECF) Appellee City of Poway Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/18/2019. [11232160] [19-55275] (Fenstermacher, Alan) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#10) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11231765] (AD) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • (#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11231757] (AD) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/18/2019. [11231747] [19-55275] (Medley, Amie) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Don Higginson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/18/2019. [11231387] [19-55275] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 03/18/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • (#6) Added attorney Julia Gomez Hernandez for California League of United Latin American Citizens, Judy Ki, Xavier Flores, Hiram Soto and Jacqueline Contreras, in case 19-55275. [11227897] (QDL) [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Julia, Gomez A. for Appellees California League of United Latin American Citizens, Jacqueline Contreras, Xavier Flores, Judy Ki and Hiram Soto. Date of service: 03/14/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11227762] [19-55275] (Gomez Hernandez, Julia) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Don Higginson Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 03/13/2019. [11226156] [19-55275] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • (#3) Added attorney William Consovoy for Don Higginson, in case 19-55275. [11226105] (QDL) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William S. Consovoy for Appellant Don Higginson. Date of service: 03/13/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11226037] [19-55275] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 03/13/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/18/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/08/2019. Transcript due 05/07/2019. Appellant Don Higginson opening brief due 06/17/2019. Appellees Xavier Becerra, California League of United Latin American Citizens, City of Poway, Jacqueline Contreras, Xavier Flores, Judy Ki and Hiram Soto answering brief due 07/16/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11222508] (JBS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.