This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/16/2023 at 07:21:04 (UTC).

Don Blankenship v. Fox News Network, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 Don Blankenship filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Fox News Network, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1207

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

 

Party Details

Defendants

35TH INC.

HONORABLE ANDREW NAPOLITANO, (Ret.)

NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE

ASSOCIATED PRESS

BOSTON GLOBE MEDIA PARTNERS, LLC

BREITBART NEWS NETWORK, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

DON BLANKENSHIP

Defendant / Appellees

FOX NEWS NETWORK, L.L.C.

CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INCORPORATED

MSNBC, CABLE LLC

WP COMPANY LLC, d/b/a The Washington Post

DOES 1-50, inclusive

MEDIAITE, LLC

FISCALNOTE, INC., d/b/a Roll Call

NEWS AND GUTS, LLC

THE CHARLESTON GAZETTE, MAIL

AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC.

TAMAR AUBER

GRIFFIN CONNOLLY

ELI LEHRER

87 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jeremy J.F. Gray

Attorney at EARLY SULLIVAN WRIGHT GIZER & MCRAE LLP

6420 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Jeffrey Scott Simpkins

Attorney at SIMPKINS LAW OFFICE PLLC

102 East 2Nd Avenue

Williamson, WV 25661

Padideh Zargari

Attorney at EARLY SULLIVAN WRIGHT GIZER & MCRAE LLP

6420 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Lisa Marie Zepeda

Attorney at EARLY SULLIVAN WRIGHT GIZER & MCRAE LLP

6420 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin Taylor Baine

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP

680 Maine Avenue, Sw

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Elbert Lin Esq.

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#110

(#110) Calendar notice sent. Nature of notice:Change in argument start time to 8:30 am.. Date: 12/07/2022. Session Starting Time: 8:30 am.. Check-in Time: 7:45 - 8:00. [1001275284] [22-1198, 22-1207] JLC [Entered: 12/01/2022 10:55 AM]

#109

(#109) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Don Blankenship in 22-1198, 22-1207. Counsel arguing: Eric P. Early. Opening argument time: 13 minutes. Rebuttal argument time: 7 minutes. .. [1001257036] [22-1198, 22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 10/28/2022 03:34 PM]

#108

(#108) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by CNBC, LLC and NBCUniversal, LLC in 22-1198, ABC, Tamar Auber, CNN, Griffin Connolly, FiscalNote, Inc., Fox News Network, L.L.C., Eli Lehrer, Mediaite, LLC, MSNBC, News and Guts, LLC, The Charleston Gazette and WP Company LLC in 22-1207. Counsel arguing: Kevin T. Baine. Answering argument time: 20 minutes. .. [1001256483] [22-1198, 22-1207] Matthew Heins [Entered: 10/28/2022 09:41 AM]

#107

(#107) CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 12/07/2022. Session Starting Time: 9:30 am. Entrance: 1000 East Main Street. Check-in Time: 8:45-9:00 am. Forms due within 7 calendar days. [1001253030] [22-1198, 22-1207] JLC [Entered: 10/24/2022 11:12 AM]

#105

(#105) ORDER filed granting Motion for leave of court to accept joint appendix as filed [ # 104 ] Copies to all parties. [1001247924] [22-1198, 22-1207] KH [Entered: 10/14/2022 11:08 AM]

104 #2

Exhibit A

104 #1

Motion for Leave of Court to Accept Joint Appendix as Previously Filed

#103

(#103) Docket correction requested from Don Blankenship in 22-1198, 22-1207. Re: [ # 85 ] appendix , [ # 84 ] appendix , [ # 83 ] appendix , [ # 82 ] appendix , [ # 81 ] appendix , [ # 80 ] appendix , [ # 79 ] appendix , [ # 78 ] appendix , [ # 77 ] appendix , [ # 76 ] appendix , [ # 75 ] appendix , [ # 74 ] appendix , [ # 73 ] appendix , [ # 72 ] appendix , [ # 71 ] appendix , [ # 70 ] appendix , [ # 69 ] appendix , [ # 68 ] appendix , [ # 67 ] appendix , [ # 66 ] appendix , [ # 65 ] appendix , [ # 64 ] appendix. Access to appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix has been restricted to case participants. [1001245289] [22-1198, 22-1207] KH [Entered: 10/11/2022 02:16 PM]

#99

(#99) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the December 6-9, 2022 argument session. Counsel shall file 4 paper copies of their briefs and appendices within 7 days. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 10/11/2022. [1001240998] [22-1198, 22-1207] JLC [Entered: 10/03/2022 04:25 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Padideh Zargari for Don Blankenship. [1001126945] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:43 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey S. Simpkins for Don Blankenship. [1001126944] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:42 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa M. Zepeda for Don Blankenship. [1001126942] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:42 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eric P. Early for Don Blankenship. [1001126941] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:41 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeremy J.F. Gray for Don Blankenship. [1001126939] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:40 AM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Don Blankenship. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001126938] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:39 AM]

#3

(#3) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Don Blankenship.. [1001126932] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:39 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00236. Mailed to: Babiak, Bastress, Brewer, Butswinkas, Early, Eisbrouch, Feder, Gidding, Goellner, Graegert, Gray, Harris, Heins, Kalinowski, Kelly, Lee, Ostrower, Sager, Scott, Shook, Takaloo, Varner, Vlahos, Wallen, Zargeri, Zpeda, Zurbuch. [1001120262] [22-1207] TF [Entered: 03/02/2022 12:50 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00236. Mailed to: Babiak, Bastress, Brewer, Butswinkas, Early, Eisbrouch, Feder, Gidding, Goellner, Graegert, Gray, Harris, Heins, Kalinowski, Kelly, Lee, Ostrower, Sager, Scott, Shook, Takaloo, Varner, Vlahos, Wallen, Zargeri, Zpeda, Zurbuch. [1001120262] [22-1207] TF [Entered: 03/02/2022 12:50 PM]

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • Docket(#111) ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Roger L. Gregory, Paul V. Niemeyer and Patricia T. Giles. Attorneys arguing case: Eric Peter Early for Appellant Don Blankenship and Kevin Taylor Baine for Appellees NBCUniversal, LLC and CNBC, LLC in 22-1198, Eric Peter Early for Appellant Don Blankenship and Kevin Taylor Baine for Appellees ABC, CNN, WP Company LLC, Fox News Network, L.L.C. and MSNBC in 22-1207. Courtroom Deputy: Joseph Coleman. [1001278642] [22-1198, 22-1207] JLC [Entered: 12/07/2022 10:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) Calendar notice sent. Nature of notice:Change in argument start time to 8:30 am.. Date: 12/07/2022. Session Starting Time: 8:30 am.. Check-in Time: 7:45 - 8:00. [1001275284] [22-1198, 22-1207] JLC [Entered: 12/01/2022 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Don Blankenship in 22-1198, 22-1207. Counsel arguing: Eric P. Early. Opening argument time: 13 minutes. Rebuttal argument time: 7 minutes. .. [1001257036] [22-1198, 22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 10/28/2022 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by CNBC, LLC and NBCUniversal, LLC in 22-1198, ABC, Tamar Auber, CNN, Griffin Connolly, FiscalNote, Inc., Fox News Network, L.L.C., Eli Lehrer, Mediaite, LLC, MSNBC, News and Guts, LLC, The Charleston Gazette and WP Company LLC in 22-1207. Counsel arguing: Kevin T. Baine. Answering argument time: 20 minutes. .. [1001256483] [22-1198, 22-1207] Matthew Heins [Entered: 10/28/2022 09:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 12/07/2022. Session Starting Time: 9:30 am. Entrance: 1000 East Main Street. Check-in Time: 8:45-9:00 am. Forms due within 7 calendar days. [1001253030] [22-1198, 22-1207] JLC [Entered: 10/24/2022 11:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) ORDER filed granting Motion for leave of court to accept joint appendix as filed [ # 104 ] Copies to all parties. [1001247924] [22-1198, 22-1207] KH [Entered: 10/14/2022 11:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Joint MOTION by Don Blankenship in 22-1198, 22-1207 for leave to file [ # 103 ]. Date and method of service: 10/13/2022 ecf. [1001247629] [22-1198, 22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 10/13/2022 05:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Docket correction requested from Don Blankenship in 22-1198, 22-1207. Re: [ # 85 ] appendix , [ # 84 ] appendix , [ # 83 ] appendix , [ # 82 ] appendix , [ # 81 ] appendix , [ # 80 ] appendix , [ # 79 ] appendix , [ # 78 ] appendix , [ # 77 ] appendix , [ # 76 ] appendix , [ # 75 ] appendix , [ # 74 ] appendix , [ # 73 ] appendix , [ # 72 ] appendix , [ # 71 ] appendix , [ # 70 ] appendix , [ # 69 ] appendix , [ # 68 ] appendix , [ # 67 ] appendix , [ # 66 ] appendix , [ # 65 ] appendix , [ # 64 ] appendix. Access to appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix , appendix has been restricted to case participants. [1001245289] [22-1198, 22-1207] KH [Entered: 10/11/2022 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the December 6-9, 2022 argument session. Counsel shall file 4 paper copies of their briefs and appendices within 7 days. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 10/11/2022. [1001240998] [22-1198, 22-1207] JLC [Entered: 10/03/2022 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Letter re: Withdrawal of Appearance of Katelyn Adams by CNBC, LLC and NBCUniversal, LLC in 22-1198, ABC, Fox News Network, L.L.C., CNN, WP Company LLC and MSNBC in 22-1207 . [1001226940] [22-1198, 22-1207] Katelyn Adams [Entered: 09/08/2022 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jenna L. Harris for News and Guts, LLC. [1001127802] [22-1207] Jenna Harris [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Padideh Zargari for Don Blankenship. [1001126945] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey S. Simpkins for Don Blankenship. [1001126944] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa M. Zepeda for Don Blankenship. [1001126942] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eric P. Early for Don Blankenship. [1001126941] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeremy J.F. Gray for Don Blankenship. [1001126939] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Don Blankenship. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001126938] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Don Blankenship.. [1001126932] [22-1207] Jeremy Gray [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00236. Mailed to: Babiak, Bastress, Brewer, Butswinkas, Early, Eisbrouch, Feder, Gidding, Goellner, Graegert, Gray, Harris, Heins, Kalinowski, Kelly, Lee, Ostrower, Sager, Scott, Shook, Takaloo, Varner, Vlahos, Wallen, Zargeri, Zpeda, Zurbuch. [1001120262] [22-1207] TF [Entered: 03/02/2022 12:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00236. Case manager: TFischer. [1001120220] [22-1207] TF [Entered: 03/02/2022 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less