This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/09/2021 at 06:32:22 (UTC).

Domingo Gomez, et al v. Donald Trump, et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Domingo Gomez filed an Other lawsuit against Donald Trump. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5332

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

EurAuPair International, Inc.

Shipco Transport, Inc.

Aja Tamamu Mariama Kinteh

Superior Scape, Inc.

K.G.S.M., 20cv2128

Mustafa Madazli, 20cv1926

Graeme John Ward, 20cv1856

Lokesh Ghanta, 20cv1907

Elie Varangba Gia, 20cv2128

Somya Arora, 20cv1906

R.M.A.A., (A Minor) 20cv1856

Yurii Ishchenko, 20cv1856

Mirna S., a Lawful Permanent Resident of the U.S.

Angela Sinon

Farid Kurbanov, 20cv1856

Claudine Ngum Fonjong

Chandan Panda, 20cv1907

Youstina Samir Baghdady Azer, 20cv2128

Itidal Mohammedsalih T Mahjoub, 20cv01856

Carmen Ligia Vidal Pimentel

55 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jesse Matthew Bless

Attorney at American Immigration Lawyers Association

1331 G Street, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20005-3142

Curtis Lee Morrison

Attorney at Law Firm of Curtis Morrison

Po Box 80844

Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688

Charles Herman Kuck

Attorney at Kuck Baxter Immigration LLC

365 Northridge Road, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30350

Bradley Bruce Banias

Attorney at Wasden Banias LLC

38 Romney Street, Suite 201

Charleston, SC 29403

Andrew John Pincus

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Cleland B. Welton II

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

Other Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Thomas Benton York

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0868

Matthew J. Glover

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Glenn Matthew Girdharry

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0868

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Entry of Appearance Filed

Open Document #2

Attachment A

Open Document #3

Attachment B

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1875538] filed that the Clerk is directed to note on the docket that this case is dismissed., No mandate shall issue. [20-5332] [Entered: 12/14/2020 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION [1874316] filed to dismiss cross appeal [20-5332]--[Edited 12/04/2020 by AH--MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT] (York, Thomas) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1874315] filed by n/a and co-counsel Thomas B. York on behalf of Appellants William Pelham Barr, DHS, DOS, Mr. Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf. [20-5332] (York, Thomas) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1871719] filed by Curtis Lee Morrison on behalf of Appellees Mohammed Abdulaziz Abdul Mohammed, Itidal Mohammedsalih T Mahjoub, R.M.A.A., A.M.A.A., J.M.A.A., Yurii Ishchenko, E.I., Pawel Mieczkowski, Farid Kurbanov, Graeme John Ward, Dmitrii Pavlovich Velikii, Claudine Ngum Fonjong, Festus Suh Neba and M.A.M.S.. [20-5332] (Morrison, Curtis) [Entered: 11/17/2020 08:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1870704] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/14/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/14/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/14/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/14/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/14/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/14/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/14/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/14/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/28/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/14/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/14/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/14/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/28/2020 [20-5332] [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1870697] filed granting motion to sever No. 20-5332 from No. 20-5292 [ # 1870668-2 ] . The consolidation of No. 20-5332 with No. 20-5292 is hereby vacated [20-5332 (Cross-appeal termed 11/12/2020) with 20-5292]; [20-5292, 20-5332].--[Edited 11/12/2020 by LMC] [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION [1870668] to sever issue filed by 3Q Digital, Nazif Alam, Juan Carlos Rosario Lebron, Claudio Alejandro Sarni Jimenez, Loida Phelps, Carmen Ligia Vidal Pimentel, Daniel Chibundu Nwankwo, Angela Sinon, Nancy Abarca, Fatma Bushati, ASSE International, Inc., EurAuPair International, Inc., Iwundu Epouse Kouadio Golden, Jodi Lynn Karpes, Shyam Sundar Koirala, Aja Tamamu Mariama Kinteh, Aya Nakamura, Superior Scape, Inc. and Shipco Transport, Inc. [Service Date: 11/11/2020 ] Length Certification: 3,087 Words. [20-5292] (Welton, Cleland) [Entered: 11/11/2020 11:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1870666] filed by Glenn M. Girdharry and co-counsel Matthew J. Glover on behalf of Appellants William Pelham Barr, DHS, DOS, Mr. Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf. [20-5332] (Glover, Matthew) [Entered: 11/11/2020 09:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1870616] filed consolidating cases 20-5332 (Cross-appeal started 11/10/2020) with 20-5292 [20-5292, 20-5332] [Entered: 11/10/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL [1870612] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01419-APM filed by William Pelham Barr, Mr. Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump, DHS, DOS and Chad F. Wolf. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5332. [20-5332] [Entered: 11/10/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5332] [Entered: 11/10/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mirna S., a Lawful Permanent Resident of the U.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where Shipco Transport, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Benton York

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glenn Matthew Girdharry