This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/24/2022 at 06:09:57 (UTC).

Dolores Calderon v. Bio-Medical Applications of Mission Hills, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Dolores Calderon filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bio-Medical Applications of Mission Hills, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55305

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendants

FRESENIUS USA, INC.

BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CAMARILLO, INC.

BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CARSON, INC.

BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF GLENDORA, INC.

FRESENIUS HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.

FRESENIUS SECURITIES, INC.

DOES, 1 through 20, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellant

DOLORES CALDERON

Defendant / Appellees

BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MISSION HILLS, INC.

FRESENIUS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ben Galante

Attorney at Galante Law, Inc.

2181 E Foothill Boulevard, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91107

Joseph Socher

3580 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Darcey Groden

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips, LLP

4747 Executive Drive, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121

Regina Alvinette Petty Esquire

Attorney at Fisher Phillips, LLP

4747 Executive Drive, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #3

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #5

Mediation Letter

1 #6

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #7

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Dolores Calderon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/30/2022. [12409410] [22-55305] (Socher, Joseph) [Entered: 03/30/2022 06:53 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/12/2022, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12410268] (CL) [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:36 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Bio-Medical Applications of Mission Hills, Inc., Biomedical Applications Management Company, Inc. and Fresenius Management Services, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/01/2022. [12411025] [22-55305] (Petty, Regina) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:54 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12418863] (CL) [Entered: 04/12/2022 02:20 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12418863] (CL) [Entered: 04/12/2022 02:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/01/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12411155]. [22-55305] (AD) [Entered: 04/01/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Bio-Medical Applications of Mission Hills, Inc., Biomedical Applications Management Company, Inc. and Fresenius Management Services, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/01/2022. [12411025] [22-55305] (Petty, Regina) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney Regina Alvinette Petty for Appellees Biomedical Applications Management Company, Inc., Fresenius Management Services, Inc. and Bio-Medical Applications of Mission Hills, Inc., in case 22-55305. [12411009] (HH) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Regina A. Petty (Fisher & Phillips, LLP, 4747 Executive Drive, Suite 1000, San Diego, CA 92121) for Appellees Bio-Medical Applications of Mission Hills, Inc., Biomedical Applications Management Company, Inc. and Fresenius Management Services, Inc.. Date of service: 04/01/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12411002] [22-55305] (Petty, Regina) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/12/2022, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12410268] (CL) [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/30/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12409437]. [22-55305] (AD) [Entered: 03/31/2022 06:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Dolores Calderon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/30/2022. [12409410] [22-55305] (Socher, Joseph) [Entered: 03/30/2022 06:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Dolores Calderon Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/01/2022. Appellant Dolores Calderon opening brief due 05/26/2022. Appellees Bio-Medical Applications of Mission Hills, Inc., Biomedical Applications Management Company, Inc. and Fresenius Management Services, Inc. answering brief due 06/27/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12405410] --[Edited 03/25/2022 by RT] (RT) [Entered: 03/25/2022 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less