This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/13/2021 at 06:06:43 (UTC).

Does, et al v. Mills, et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Does filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Mills. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1826

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

JOHN DOES, 1-3

JACK DOES, 1-1000

JANE DOES, 1-6

JOAN DOES, 1-1000

Defendant / Appellees

JANET T. MILLS, in her official capacity as Governor of the State of Maine

JEANNE LAMBREW

NIRAV D. SHAH, in his official capacity as Director of the Maine Center for Disease Control and Prevention

MAINEHEALTH

GENESIS HEALTHCARE OF MAINE LLC

GENESIS HEALTHCARE LLC

NORTHERN LIGHT HEALTH FOUNDATION

MAINEGENERAL HEALTH

Amicus Curiae

AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE

AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE

DISCIPLES CENTER FOR PUBLIC WITNESS

DISCIPLES JUSTICE ACTION NETWORK

EQUAL PARTNERS IN FAITH

INTERFAITH ALLIANCE FOUNDATION

METHODIST FEDERATION FOR SOCIAL ACTION

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Richard Brian Katskee

Attorney at Americans United for Separation of Church and State

1310 L St Nw, Ste 200

Washington, DC 20005

Alexander Joseph Luchenitser

Attorney at Americans United for Separation of Church and State

1310 L St Nw, Ste 200

Washington, DC 20005

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Joseph Schmid

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

Po Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Matthew D. Staver

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

Po Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Stephen C. Whiting

Attorney at Whiting Law Firm

75 Pearl St, Ste 207

Portland, ME 04101-0000

Roger K. Gannam

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

Po Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Horatio Gabriel Mihet

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

Po Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Defendant / Appellee and Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Thomas A. Knowlton

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

Kimberly Leehaug Patwardhan

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

Valerie A. Wright

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

James R. Erwin

Attorney at Pierce Atwood LLP

254 Commercial St

Portland, ME 04101

Katharine Ives Rand

Attorney at Pierce Atwood LLP

254 Commercial St

Portland, ME 04101

Ryan P. Dumais

Attorney at Eaton Peabody

77 Sewall Street, Suite 3000

Augusta, ME 04330-3000

Katherine Lee Porter

Attorney at Eaton Peabody

100 Middle St, Po Box 15235

Portland, ME 04112-5235

Richard Brian Katskee

Attorney at Americans United for Separation of Church and State

1310 L St Nw, Ste 200

Washington, DC 20005

Alexander Joseph Luchenitser

Attorney at Americans United for Separation of Church and State

1310 L St Nw, Ste 200

Washington, DC 20005

Emma Bond

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Maine Foundation

Po Box 7860

Portland, ME 04112

Zachary Heiden

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Maine Foundation

Po Box 7860

Portland, ME 04112

Daniel Mach

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

915 15Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Heather L. Weaver

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

915 15Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ERRATA issued by court to opinion (published) [ # 6453714-2 ]. [21-1826] (SBT) [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:16 AM]

Open Document

U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE advising a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 11/11/2021 and assigned case number 21-717. [21-1826] (GAK) [Entered: 11/17/2021 04:34 PM]

Open Document

MANDATE issued. [21-1826] (GB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 05:55 AM]

Open Document

URLs Cited in Court Opinion dated 10/19/2021 [ # 6453714-2 ]. [21-1826] (GAK) [Entered: 10/20/2021 09:24 AM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT. The district court's order denying a preliminary injunction is affirmed. [21-1826] (SBT) [Entered: 10/19/2021 06:53 PM]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #6

Exhibit 5 - Order Denying Injunction Pending Appeal

Open Document #5

Exhibit 4 - Motion for TRO, Preliminary Injunction, or Injunction Pending Appeal

Open Document #4

Exhibit 3 - Verified Complaint and Exhibits

Open Document #3

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1 - Order Denying Preliminary Injunction

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketERRATA issued by court to opinion (published) [ # 6453714-2 ]. [21-1826] (SBT) [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketU.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE advising a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 11/11/2021 and assigned case number 21-717. [21-1826] (GAK) [Entered: 11/17/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE issued. [21-1826] (GB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 05:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6453546-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Maine, Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Disciples Center For Public Witness, Disciples Justice Action Network, Equal Partners In Faith, Global Justice Institute, Interfaith Alliance Foundation, Methodist Federation for Social Action, Metropolitan Community Churches, Muslim Advocates, National Council of Jewish Women and Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association. [21-1826] (LIM) [Entered: 10/21/2021 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6453356-2 ] submitted by Appellants Jack Does, Jane Does, Joan Does and John Does. [21-1826] (AJ) [Entered: 10/20/2021 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6453343-2 ] submitted by Appellee Northern Light Health Foundation. [21-1826] (AJ) [Entered: 10/20/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6453336-2 ] submitted by Appellees Genesis Healthcare LLC, Genesis Healthcare of Maine LLC, MaineGeneral Health and MaineHealth. [21-1826] (AJ) [Entered: 10/20/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6453365-2 ] submitted by Appellees Jeanne Lambrew, Janet T. Mills and Doctor Nirav D. Shah. [21-1826] (AJ) [Entered: 10/20/2021 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURLs Cited in Court Opinion dated 10/19/2021 [ # 6453714-2 ]. [21-1826] (GAK) [Entered: 10/20/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT. The district court's order denying a preliminary injunction is affirmed. [21-1826] (SBT) [Entered: 10/19/2021 06:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees MaineGeneral Health, MaineHealth, Genesis Healthcare LLC and Genesis Healthcare of Maine LLC filed by Attorney Katharine I. Rand. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2021. [21-1826] (KIR) [Entered: 10/14/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees MaineHealth, Genesis Healthcare of Maine LLC, Genesis Healthcare LLC and MaineGeneral Health filed by Attorney James R. Erwin. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2021. [21-1826] (JRE) [Entered: 10/14/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Northern Light Health Foundation filed by Attorney Ryan Dumais. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2021. [21-1826] (RPD) [Entered: 10/14/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Jeanne Lambrew, Janet T. Mills and Doctor Nirav D. Shah filed by Attorney Kimberly L. Patwardhan. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2021. [21-1826] (KLP) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered. Defendant-appellees shall file their response to Plaintiff-Appellants' Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal by 9:00 a.m. on Friday, October 15, 2021. No extensions will be allowed. [21-1826] (GAK) [Entered: 10/14/2021 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jack Does, Jane Does, Joan Does and John Does filed by Attorney Horatio Mihet. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2021. [21-1826] (HGM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jack Does, Jane Does, Joan Does and John Does filed by Attorney Roger K. Gannam. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2021. [21-1826] (RKG) [Entered: 10/14/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jack Does, Jane Does, John Does and Joan Does filed by Attorney Daniel J. Schmid. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2021. [21-1826] (DJS) [Entered: 10/14/2021 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants Jack Does, Jane Does, Joan Does and John Does. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2021. [21-1826] (DJS) [Entered: 10/14/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #66) filed by Appellants Jack Does, Jane Does, Joan Does and John Does. Docketing Statement,Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 10/28/2021. [21-1826] (GAK) [Entered: 10/14/2021 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHERN LIGHT HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where Disciples Center for Public Witness is a litigant