This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/19/2019 at 06:05:49 (UTC).

Doe v. University of Denver, et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against University of Denver. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1359

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KRISTIN OLSON, individually and as agent for University of Denver

REBECCA CHOPP, individually and as agent for University of Denver

UNIVERSITY OF DENVER

SIRI SLATER, individually and as agent for University of Denver

ERIC BUTLER, individually and as agent for University of Denver

JEAN MCALLISTER, individually and as agent for University of Denver

UNIVERSITY OF DENVER BOARD OF TRUSTEES

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jim Goh

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

Erin R. Mangum

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Tara Jill Davis

Attorney at Nesenoff & Miltenberg

363 Seventh Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Michael J. Mirabella

Attorney at Campbell, Bohn, Killin, Brittan & Ray

270 St. Paul Street, Suite 200

Denver, CO 80206

Andrew Miltenberg

Attorney at Nesenoff & Miltenberg

363 Seventh Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Stuart Bernstein

Attorney at Nesenoff & Miltenberg

363 Seventh Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10689816] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on appellant's motion for a 60-day extension of time to file opening brief. At the direction of the court, the motion is granted. Appellant's brief and appendix are now due on 01/17/2020 for John Doe. The court will not grant additional extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. Served on 10/24/2019. [19-1359] [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:32 PM]

Open Document

[10689597] Motion filed by Appellant John Doe to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 01/17/2020. Served on: 10/24/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1359] SB [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:25 AM]

Open Document

[10684814] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jim Goh and Erin R Mangum for University of Denver, University of Denver Board of Trustees, Rebecca Chopp, Kristin Olson, Jean McAllister, Siri Slater and Eric Butler. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 10/07/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1359] [Entered: 10/07/2019 08:01 AM]

Open Document

[10684680] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael J. Mirabella for John Doe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1359] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:03 PM]

Open Document

[10684645] Docketing statement filed by John Doe. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1359] MJM [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:07 PM]

Open Document

[10684597] Entry of appearance filed by Stuart Bernstein, Tara Jill Davis and Andrew Miltenberg for John Doe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1359] [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:52 AM]

Open Document

[10684570] Notice received from John Doe that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1359] AM [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:27 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10689816] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on appellant's motion for a 60-day extension of time to file opening brief. At the direction of the court, the motion is granted. Appellant's brief and appendix are now due on 01/17/2020 for John Doe. The court will not grant additional extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. Served on 10/24/2019. [19-1359] [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10689597] Motion filed by Appellant John Doe to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 01/17/2020. Served on: 10/24/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1359] SB [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • [10684838] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 10/07/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix are due on 11/18/2019 for John Doe. [19-1359] [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10684814] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jim Goh and Erin R Mangum for University of Denver, University of Denver Board of Trustees, Rebecca Chopp, Kristin Olson, Jean McAllister, Siri Slater and Eric Butler. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 10/07/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1359] [Entered: 10/07/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • [10684776] Entry of appearance submitted by Jim Goh and E. Rayner Mangum for Appellees Eric Butler, Rebecca Chopp, Jean McAllister, Kristin Olson, Siri Slater, University of Denver and University of Denver Board of Trustees for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1359]--[Edited 10/07/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 10/7/2019] JG [Entered: 10/04/2019 06:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10684680] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael J. Mirabella for John Doe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1359] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10684645] Docketing statement filed by John Doe. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1359] MJM [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • [10684642] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael J. Mirabella for Appellant John Doe for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/04/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1359] MJM [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10684597] Entry of appearance filed by Stuart Bernstein, Tara Jill Davis and Andrew Miltenberg for John Doe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1359] [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • [10684590] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 10/11/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1359] [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10684570] Notice received from John Doe that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1359] AM [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • [10684569] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew T. Miltenberg, Stuart Bernstein and Tara J. Davis for Appellant John Doe for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/04/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1359] AM [Entered: 10/04/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10680321] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/20/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/04/2019 for John Doe.Notice of appearance due on 10/04/2019 for Eric Butler, Rebecca Chopp, Jean McAllister, Kristin Olson, Siri Slater, University of Denver and University of Denver Board of Trustees. [19-1359] [Entered: 09/20/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Denver is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart Bernstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Miltenberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara Jill Davis