This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/12/2021 at 06:07:52 (UTC).

Doe Run Resources Corporation v. St. Paul Fire & Marine Ins Co

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Doe Run Resources Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against St Paul Fire Marine Ins Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3046

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Doe Run Resources Corporation

Defendant / Appellee

St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Douglas J. Brown

Attorney at HALPERN & MAY

Suite 1060600 W. Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Marc D. Halpern

Attorney at HALPERN & MAY

Suite 1060600 W. Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Thomas P. Hohenstein

Attorney at POLSINELLI, PC

Suite 1000100 S. Fourth Street

Saint Louis, MO 63102-2750

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Fedder

Attorney at DENTONS US, LLP

3000 One Metropolitan Square211 North Broadway

Saint Louis, MO 63102-0000

Joel Matthew Graczyk

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

Suite 5900233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-6404

Stephen Jerome O'Brien

Attorney at DENTONS US, LLP

3000 One Metropolitan Square211 North Broadway

Saint Louis, MO 63102-0000

Donna J. Vobornik

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

Suite 5900233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-6404

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Paper Brief, Doc No. [5093825-2], filed by Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation. [5093292] [21-3046]--[Edited to link to correct dkt entry 11/05/2021 by HAG] (MDH) [Entered: 11/02/2021 01:31 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Doe Run Resources Corporation, w/service 10/28/2021. Length: 12,088 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Doe Run Resources Corporation due 11/02/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company due on 11/29/2021. [5091792] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/28/2021 10:21 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Record Deficiency Sent to Mr. Douglas J. Brown for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation and Mr. Marc D. Halpern for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation. Record Deficiency due on 11/01/2021. [5090982-1] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:40 AM]

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation, w/service 10/26/2021. [5090981] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:39 AM]

Open Document

Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Marc D. Halpern for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation. [5090970] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:24 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Douglas J. Brown for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation w/service 09/20/2021 [5078604] [21-3046] (DJB) [Entered: 09/20/2021 04:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Marc D. Halpern for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation w/service 09/20/2021 [5078601] [21-3046] (MDH) [Entered: 09/20/2021 04:31 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Joel M. Graczyk for Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company w/service 09/16/2021 [5077192] [21-3046] (JMG) [Entered: 09/16/2021 09:24 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [5077129] [21-3046] (DJV) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:57 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Donna J. Vobornik for Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company w/service 09/15/2021 [5077128] [21-3046] (DJV) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:55 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by David M. Fedder for Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company w/service 09/15/2021 [5077127] [21-3046] (DF) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:52 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPaper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 5091792-2 ] filed by Doe Run Resources Corporation 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [5093825] [21-3046] (NDG) [Entered: 11/03/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Paper Brief, Doc No. [5093825-2], filed by Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation. [5093292] [21-3046]--[Edited to link to correct dkt entry 11/05/2021 by HAG] (MDH) [Entered: 11/02/2021 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 4 volumes, 1 box, Comments: 3 sets in 1 box [5092373] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/29/2021 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Doe Run Resources Corporation, w/service 10/28/2021. Length: 12,088 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Doe Run Resources Corporation due 11/02/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company due on 11/29/2021. [5091792] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/28/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Doe Run Resources Corporation submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5091686] [21-3046] (MDH) [Entered: 10/27/2021 10:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRecord Deficiency Sent to Mr. Douglas J. Brown for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation and Mr. Marc D. Halpern for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation. Record Deficiency due on 11/01/2021. [5090982-1] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation, w/service 10/26/2021. [5090981] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Marc D. Halpern for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation. [5090970] [21-3046] (HAG) [Entered: 10/26/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Doe Run Resources Corporation and St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. **LOCKED - COUNSEL NOTIFIED THAT THE APPENDIX IS FILED IN PAPER COPY ONLY** [5090824] [21-3046] [5090824] [21-3046]--[Edited to indicate locked 10/26/2021 by HAG] (MDH) [Entered: 10/25/2021 10:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Doe Run Resources Corporation. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5090823] [21-3046] (MDH) [Entered: 10/25/2021 10:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Douglas J. Brown for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation w/service 09/20/2021 [5078604] [21-3046] (DJB) [Entered: 09/20/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Marc D. Halpern for Appellant Doe Run Resources Corporation w/service 09/20/2021 [5078601] [21-3046] (MDH) [Entered: 09/20/2021 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Joel M. Graczyk for Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company w/service 09/16/2021 [5077192] [21-3046] (JMG) [Entered: 09/16/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [5077129] [21-3046] (DJV) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Donna J. Vobornik for Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company w/service 09/15/2021 [5077128] [21-3046] (DJV) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by David M. Fedder for Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company w/service 09/15/2021 [5077127] [21-3046] (DF) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Stephen J. O'brien for Appellee St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company w/service 09/15/2021 [5077124] [21-3046] (SJO) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 10/25/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Doe Run Resources Corporation due 10/25/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5075534] [21-3046] (CJO) [Entered: 09/13/2021 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order 08/17/2021, and Order of Dismissal 08/17/2021. [5075531] [21-3046] (CJO) [Entered: 09/13/2021 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5075527] [21-3046] (CJO) [Entered: 09/13/2021 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPAN is a litigant