This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 06:14:40 (UTC).

Doe, et al v. Newton Public Schools, et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Doe filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Newton Public Schools. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1505

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant

BUREAU OF SPECIAL EDUCATION APPEALS, Of the Massachusetts Division of Administrative Law Appeals

Plaintiff / Appellees

JOHN DOE

JANE DOE

DAVID DOE

Defendant / Appellants

NEWTON PUBLIC SCHOOLS

MA BUREAU OF SPECIAL EDUCATION APPEALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Laronica King Lightfoot

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Maura Tracy Healey

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Jill M. Murray

Attorney at Newton Public Schools

100 Walnut St

Newton, MA 02460

Carolyn Weisman

Attorney at City of Newton Law Department

1000 Commonwealth Ave

Newton, MA 02459

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Eileen M. Hagerty

Attorney at Kotin Crabtree & Strong LLP

1 Bowdoin Sq, 8Th Flr

Boston, MA 02114-2925

Alicia M.P. Warren

Attorney at Kotin Crabtree & Strong LLP

1 Bowdoin Sq, 8Th Flr

Boston, MA 02114-2925

Other Attorneys

Jill M. Murray-Grady

Attorney at Newton Public Schools

100 Walnut St

Newton, MA 02460

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered: The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefs is granted in part and denied in part. The time for Defendants-Appellants/Cross-Appellees Newton Public Schools and Bureau of Special Education Appeals to file a principal brief and appendix is enlarged to and including October 4, 2021 . The parties' request to extend time to file their remaining briefs is denied without prejudice as premature because defendants-appellants/cross-appellees' principal brief has not yet been served. Fed. R. App. P. 28.1(f). [21-1505, 21-1535, 21-1539] (ALW) [Entered: 09/07/2021 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants David Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe and Appellants/Cross-Appellees MA Bureau of Special Education Appeals and Newton Public Schools in 21-1505, 21-1535, 21-1539. Certificate of service dated 09/02/2021. [21-1505, 21-1535, 21-1539] (JMM) [Entered: 09/02/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief and Appendix due 09/20/2021 for appellant MA Bureau of Special Education Appeals and Newton Public Schools. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1505, 21-1535, 21-1539]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. (ALW) [Entered: 08/08/2021 07:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellee MA Bureau of Special Education Appeals filed by Attorney LaRonica K. Lightfoot. Certificate of service dated 08/06/2021. [21-1505] (LKL) [Entered: 08/06/2021 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1. The briefing schedule set in No. 21-1505 on July 19, 2021 is vacated. A briefing schedule will be set once the record on appeal, including all necessary transcripts, is complete. The attached information sheet sets forth the filing requirements for briefs filed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28.1. [21-1505, 21-1535, 21-1539]. (DO) [Entered: 07/23/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Newton Public Schools filed by Attorney Carolyn A. Weisman. Certificate of service dated 07/21/2021. [21-1505] (CW) [Entered: 07/21/2021 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees David Doe, Jane Doe and John Doe filed by Attorney Eileen M. Hagerty. Certificate of service dated 07/20/2021. [21-1505] (EMH) [Entered: 07/20/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 08/30/2021 for appellant Newton Public Schools. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1505] (ALW) [Entered: 07/19/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE of service for transcript report/order form [ # 6434659-2 ], docketing statement [ # 6434658-2 ], notice of appearance [ # 6434657-2 ] filed by Appellant Newton Public Schools. Certificate of service dated 07/19/2021. [21-1505] (JMM) [Entered: 07/19/2021 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Newton Public Schools indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/19/2021. [21-1505] (JMM) [Entered: 07/19/2021 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Newton Public Schools. Certificate of service dated 07/19/2021. [21-1505] (JMM) [Entered: 07/19/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Newton Public Schools filed by Attorney Jill Murray Grady. Certificate of service dated 07/19/2021. [21-1505] (JMM) [Entered: 07/19/2021 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #88) filed by Appellant Newton Public Schools. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, Appearance form, and Fee due 07/27/2021. [21-1505] (ALW) [Entered: 07/13/2021 01:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWTON PUBLIC SCHOOLS is a litigant

Latest cases where Bureau Of Special Education Appeals Of Massachusetts is a litigant