This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 07:03:30 (UTC).

DMJ Associates, L.L.C. v. Capasso

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 DMJ Associates, L L C filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Capasso. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-3435

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Ford Motor Company

United States Department of the Air Force

United States Navy

Ingersoll-Rand Company

DaimlerChrysler Corporation

Kraft Foods Global, Inc.

Paribas North America

Refinement International Corporation

United States Department of the Coast Guard

Counter Claimant

Clairol, Incorporated

3Rd Party Defendants and Defendants

Colonial Pipeline Company

Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation

United States Department of the Air Force

United States Navy

Eveready Battery Company, Inc., AKA Energizer Holdings, Inc.

Kraft Foods Global, Inc.

Heroux-Devtek Inc., FKA Heroux, Inc.

Ware Chemical, AKA Kraft Foods North America, Incorporated

Crosman Corporation, FKA Coleman Airguns, Inc., FKA Crosman Arms Company, Inc.

American Brass-Anaconda, AKA Outokumpu American Brass, Incorporated

Heli-Coli Corporation

United States Department of the Coast Guard

Conrail, Inc., AKA Penn Central Railroad

Neapco, Inc.

Defendant and Not Yet Classified

Paribas North America

177 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Allen Gary Reiter Esq.

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

1675 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Andrew E. Anselmi Esq.

Attorney at McCusker, Anselmi, Rosen & Carvelli, P.C.

210 Park Avenue

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Jennifer L. White Esq.

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

1675 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Thomas R. Smith

Attorney at Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC

1 Lincoln Center, 110 West Fayette Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 01/12/2017, disposing of the appeal to EDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1946214] [16-3435] [Entered: 01/12/2017 11:56 AM]

#48

(#48) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to dismiss appeal [ # 26 ] filed by Appellee Quanta Resources Corporation, by RCW, PWH, CFD, FILED. [1932366][48] [16-3435] [Entered: 12/20/2016 04:35 PM]

#47

(#47) NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Murray, ASSIGNED.[1932353] [16-3435] [Entered: 12/20/2016 04:28 PM]

#43

(#43) SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1922035] [16-3435] [Entered: 12/07/2016 10:30 AM]

#37

(#37) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 33 ], on behalf of Appellee Quanta Resource Corporation, FILED. Service date 11/25/2016 by CM/ECF.[1914012][37] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/25/2016 06:17 PM]

33 #2

Supporting Document

33 #1

Opposition FILED

#26

(#26) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Quanta Resource Corporation, FILED. Service date 11/08/2016 by CM/ECF. [1903147] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/08/2016 08:52 PM]

#24

(#24) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc. Brief due date as 12/16/2016. Joint Appendix due date as 12/16/2016, FILED.[1898788] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/02/2016 04:36 PM]

9 #3

Supporting Document

9 #2

Supporting Document

9 #1

Form C FILED

4 #2

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

4 #1

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/22/2016, RECEIVED.[1882452] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/12/2016 03:33 PM]

#2

(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc., district court docket entry re: receipt # 0207-8977885, FILED.[1882451] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/12/2016 03:32 PM]

1 #2

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#1

Case FILED

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 01/12/2017, disposing of the appeal to EDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1946214] [16-3435] [Entered: 01/12/2017 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to dismiss appeal [ # 26 ] filed by Appellee Quanta Resources Corporation, by RCW, PWH, CFD, FILED. [1932366][48] [16-3435] [Entered: 12/20/2016 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Murray, ASSIGNED.[1932353] [16-3435] [Entered: 12/20/2016 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1922035] [16-3435] [Entered: 12/07/2016 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Docket(#39) CAPTION, correcting party name to "Quanta Resources Corporation," AMENDED.[1914122] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/28/2016 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 33 ], on behalf of Appellee Quanta Resource Corporation, FILED. Service date 11/25/2016 by CM/ECF.[1914012][37] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/25/2016 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to dismiss [ # 26 ], on behalf of Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/18/2016 by CM/ECF. [1910512] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/18/2016 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Quanta Resource Corporation, FILED. Service date 11/08/2016 by CM/ECF. [1903147] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/08/2016 08:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc. Brief due date as 12/16/2016. Joint Appendix due date as 12/16/2016, FILED.[1898788] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/02/2016 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 12/16/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 11/02/2016 by CM/ECF.[1898418] [16-3435] [Entered: 11/02/2016 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2016
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Exxon Mobil Corporation, FILED. Service date 10/25/2016 by CM/ECF.[1891606] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/25/2016 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1890127] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/24/2016 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/24/2016 by CM/ECF.[1889919] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/24/2016 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/24/2016 by CM/ECF.[1889915] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/24/2016 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/24/2016 by CM/ECF.[1889910] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/24/2016 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Docket(#5) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Andrew E. Anselmi, Esq. for Appellee Exxon Mobil Corporation, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[1882457] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/12/2016 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1882454] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/12/2016 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/22/2016, RECEIVED.[1882452] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/12/2016 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc., district court docket entry re: receipt # 0207-8977885, FILED.[1882451] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/12/2016 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Revere Copper Products, Inc., FILED. [1882447] [16-3435] [Entered: 10/12/2016 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Niagara Mohawk Power Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL PIPELINE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where KRAFT FOODS GLOBAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION is a litigant