This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2020 at 06:10:07 (UTC).

Ditech Financial LLC, et al v. Dutch Oven Court Trust, et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Ditech Financial LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Dutch Oven Court Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15066

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants

TALASERA AND VICANTO HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.

Counter Claimant

DUTCH OVEN COURT TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Rex D. Garner

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Counter Claimant Attorney

Michael F. Bohn

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Bohn

2260 Corporate Circle, Suite 480

Hednerson, NV 89074

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 03/27/2020. See order for details. [11628095] (CL) [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:23 PM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 03/12/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11604742] (CL) [Entered: 02/21/2020 11:45 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and FNMA/Fannie Mae Stipulated Motion for miscellaneous relief [Dismissal of Claims Against Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC]. Date of service: 01/30/2020. [11579967] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [6] .] (TYL) [Entered: 01/30/2020 03:16 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/20/2020, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11579848] (CL) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:22 PM]

4 #2

Exhibit A-

4 #1

Notice of Bankruptcy Status

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Dutch Oven Court Trust Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2020. [11570936] [20-15066] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:15 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 03/27/2020. See order for details. [11628095] (CL) [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 03/12/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11604742] (CL) [Entered: 02/21/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and FNMA/Fannie Mae Stipulated Motion for miscellaneous relief [Dismissal of Claims Against Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC]. Date of service: 01/30/2020. [11579967] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [6] .] (TYL) [Entered: 01/30/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#6) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and FNMA/Fannie Mae Correspondence: Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Against Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC. Date of service: 01/30/2020 [11579864] [20-15066] (Garner, Rex) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/20/2020, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11579848] (CL) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Ditech Financial LLC Correspondence: Notice of Bankruptcy Status. Date of service: 01/30/2020 [11579580] [20-15066] (Garner, Rex) [Entered: 01/30/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11571128]. [20-15066] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Dutch Oven Court Trust Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2020. [11570936] [20-15066] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Dutch Oven Court Trust Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2020. Transcript ordered by 02/12/2020. Transcript due 03/13/2020. Appellant Dutch Oven Court Trust opening brief due 04/22/2020. Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 05/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11562968] (JBS) [Entered: 01/15/2020 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less