This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/14/2021 at 06:05:53 (UTC).

Dino Drop, Inc., et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Dino Drop, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2718

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

DINO DROP, INC., dba M-Brew, dba Dino's Lounge

BUCCAROO, LLC

DM BACH ENTERPRISES, LLC

BUCAROO TOO, LLC

45 DEGREE HOSPITALITY, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James Joseph Kelly

Attorney at Law Office

30300 Northwestern Highway, Suite 324

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Dennis M. Dolan

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Bradford S. Moyer

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

333 Bridge Street, N.W., Suite 530

Grand Rapids, MI 49504

 

Court Documents

#18

(#22) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company in 21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718 by Laurence J.W. Tooth. Certificate of Service: 09/13/2021. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (LJT) [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:19 PM]

#20

(#21) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Chelsea Ventures, LLC in 21-2715, Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Brown Jug, Inc. in 21-2644, Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Dino Drop, Inc., Buccaroo, LLC, DM Bach Enterprises, LLC, Bucaroo Too, LLC and 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc. in 21-2718. Certificate of Service: 08/16/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-2715, 21-2644, 21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 08/16/2021 06:55 PM]

#18

(#20) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/16/2021; appellee brief due 09/15/2021. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:16 PM]

17 #2

clerk order filed

17 #1

Cover Letter

#15

(#19) ORDER filed: The motion [ # 6644687-2 ] [ # 6644700-2 ] [ # 15 ] is GRANTED, and these appeals are hereby CONSOLIDATED for briefing and submission to the court. A new consolidated briefing schedule shall issue separately, whereby the plaintiffs shall file a single consolidated principal brief by August 16, 2021; the defendant shall file a single consolidated responsive brief by September 15, 2021; and the plaintiffs shall have 21 days thereafter to file an optional single consolidated reply brief. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:11 PM]

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dennis M. Dolan for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (DMD) [Entered: 07/23/2021 05:17 PM]

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) MOTION filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, Dino Drop, Inc. and DM Bach Enterprises, LLC to consolidate cases Case No. 21-2644, The Brown Jug, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company; Case No. 21-2715, Chelsea Ventures, LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, Case No. 21-2718, Dino Drop, Inc., et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company.. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:54 PM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellants 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718]--[Edited 07/23/2021 by GSA] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:45 AM]

#8

(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellants 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, Dino Drop, Inc. and DM Bach Enterprises, LLC.. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:37 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, Dino Drop, Inc. and DM Bach Enterprises, LLC by James J. Kelly. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:33 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Bradford S. Moyer. Certificate of Service: 07/16/2021. [21-2718] (BSM) [Entered: 07/16/2021 04:54 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Dennis M. Dolan. Certificate of Service: 07/16/2021. [21-2718] (DMD) [Entered: 07/16/2021 03:10 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, DM Bach Enterprises, LLC and Dino Drop, Inc.. Transcript needed: n. (GSA) [Entered: 07/16/2021 01:53 PM]

#13

(#19) ORDER filed: The motion [ # 6644687-2 ] [ # 6644700-2 ] [ # 15 ] is GRANTED, and these appeals are hereby CONSOLIDATED for briefing and submission to the court. A new consolidated briefing schedule shall issue separately, whereby the plaintiffs shall file a single consolidated principal brief by August 16, 2021; the defendant shall file a single consolidated responsive brief by September 15, 2021; and the plaintiffs shall have 21 days thereafter to file an optional single consolidated reply brief. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:11 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company in 21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718 by Laurence J.W. Tooth. Certificate of Service: 09/13/2021. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (LJT) [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Chelsea Ventures, LLC in 21-2715, Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Brown Jug, Inc. in 21-2644, Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Dino Drop, Inc., Buccaroo, LLC, DM Bach Enterprises, LLC, Bucaroo Too, LLC and 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc. in 21-2718. Certificate of Service: 08/16/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-2715, 21-2644, 21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 08/16/2021 06:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/16/2021; appellee brief due 09/15/2021. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER filed: The motion [ # 6644687-2 ] [ # 6644700-2 ] [ # 15 ] is GRANTED, and these appeals are hereby CONSOLIDATED for briefing and submission to the court. A new consolidated briefing schedule shall issue separately, whereby the plaintiffs shall file a single consolidated principal brief by August 16, 2021; the defendant shall file a single consolidated responsive brief by September 15, 2021; and the plaintiffs shall have 21 days thereafter to file an optional single consolidated reply brief. [21-2644, 21-2715, 21-2718] (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docket(#18) The case manager for this case is now: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dennis M. Dolan for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (DMD) [Entered: 07/23/2021 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) **DOCUMENT LOCKED * COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE DOCUMENT AS .pdf * DOCUMENT SHOULD NOT BE EDITABLE** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dennis M. Dolan for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718]--[Edited 07/23/2021 by GSA] (DMD) [Entered: 07/23/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, Dino Drop, Inc. and DM Bach Enterprises, LLC to consolidate cases Case No. 21-2644, The Brown Jug, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company; Case No. 21-2715, Chelsea Ventures, LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, Case No. 21-2718, Dino Drop, Inc., et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company.. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellants DM Bach Enterprises, LLC Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718]--[Edited 07/23/2021 by GSA] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellants Dino Drop, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718]--[Edited 07/23/2021 by GSA] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellants 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718]--[Edited 07/23/2021 by GSA] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. James Joseph Kelly for 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, Dino Drop, Inc. and DM Bach Enterprises, LLC. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. James Joseph Kelly for Appellants 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, Dino Drop, Inc. and DM Bach Enterprises, LLC.. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, Dino Drop, Inc. and DM Bach Enterprises, LLC by James J. Kelly. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2021. [21-2718] (JJK) [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Bradford S. Moyer. Certificate of Service: 07/16/2021. [21-2718] (BSM) [Entered: 07/16/2021 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS .pdf - DOCUMENT SHOULD NOT BE EDITABLE** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Bradford S. Moyer. Certificate of Service: 07/16/2021. [21-2718]--[Edited 07/16/2021 by GSA] (BSM) [Entered: 07/16/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO COMPLETE THE FORM IN FULL AND ANSWER ALL QUESTIONS IN FULL** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dennis M. Dolan for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 07/16/2021. [21-2718]--[Edited 07/16/2021 by GSA] (DMD) [Entered: 07/16/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company by Dennis M. Dolan. Certificate of Service: 07/16/2021. [21-2718] (DMD) [Entered: 07/16/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Gretchen S. Abruzzo (GSA) [Entered: 07/16/2021 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants 45 Degree Hospitality, Inc., Bucaroo Too, LLC, Buccaroo, LLC, DM Bach Enterprises, LLC and Dino Drop, Inc.. Transcript needed: n. (GSA) [Entered: 07/16/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford S. Moyer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis M. Dolan