This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/31/2022 at 06:12:35 (UTC).

Dillard Putman v. Quentin Harris

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Dillard Putman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Quentin Harris. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1360

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

SERGEANT TRAVIS HAYTON

Plaintiff / Appellee

DILLARD A. PUTMAN

Defendant / Appellant

CORPORAL QUENTIN HARRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Darrell J. Getman

Attorney at HALPERIN LAW CENTER

4435 Waterfront Drive

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Jonathan Eric Halperin

4435 Waterfront Drive

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Andrew Lucchetti

Attorney at HALPERIN LAW CENTER

4435 Waterfront Drive

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Darrell Jordan Getman

4435 Waterfront Drive

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Julian Friedman Harf

Attorney at GUYNN WADDELL CARROLL & LOCKABY, P.C.

415 South College Avenue

Salem, VA 24153-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00063-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: NaeemahSims. [1001139070] [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/01/2022 01:19 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00063-JPJ-PMS. Mailed to: Darrell Jordan Getman, HALPERIN LAW CENTER, Suite 100, 4435 Waterfront Drive, Glen Allen, VA 23060. [1001139081] [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/01/2022 01:26 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Julian F. Harf for Quentin Harris. [1001146083] [22-1360] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:18 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quentin Harris. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001146085] [22-1360] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:20 PM]

#5

(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Quentin Harris.. [1001146089] [22-1360] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:22 PM]

#6

(#6) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Darrell Jordan Getman, HALPERIN LAW CENTER, Suite 100, 4435 Waterfront Drive, Glen Allen, VA 23060. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001146101] Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/24/2022. Response Brief due 06/23/2022. [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:27 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew Lucchetti for Dillard A. Putman. [1001146515] [22-1360] Isaac McBeth [Entered: 04/15/2022 10:27 AM]

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dillard A. Putman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001146522] [22-1360] Isaac McBeth [Entered: 04/15/2022 10:29 AM]

#10

(#10) Docket correction requested from Dillard A. Putman. Re: [ # 8 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. Mailed to: Darrell Jordan Getman. [1001146650] [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/15/2022 12:26 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Darrell J. Getman for Dillard A. Putman. [1001147142] [22-1360] Darrell Getman [Entered: 04/18/2022 09:24 AM]

#12

(#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001147198] [22-1360] LHP [Entered: 04/18/2022 10:09 AM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/06/2022. Response brief due 07/06/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001151519] [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:37 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/06/2022. Response brief due 07/06/2022. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001151519] [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001147198] [22-1360] LHP [Entered: 04/18/2022 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Darrell J. Getman for Dillard A. Putman. [1001147142] [22-1360] Darrell Getman [Entered: 04/18/2022 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket correction requested from Dillard A. Putman. Re: [ # 8 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. Mailed to: Darrell Jordan Getman. [1001146650] [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/15/2022 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dillard A. Putman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001146522] [22-1360] Isaac McBeth [Entered: 04/15/2022 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Darrell Getman for Dillard A. Putman. [1001146519] [22-1360] Isaac McBeth [Entered: 04/15/2022 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew Lucchetti for Dillard A. Putman. [1001146515] [22-1360] Isaac McBeth [Entered: 04/15/2022 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Darrell Jordan Getman, HALPERIN LAW CENTER, Suite 100, 4435 Waterfront Drive, Glen Allen, VA 23060. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001146101] Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/24/2022. Response Brief due 06/23/2022. [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Quentin Harris.. [1001146089] [22-1360] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quentin Harris. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001146085] [22-1360] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Julian F. Harf for Quentin Harris. [1001146083] [22-1360] Julian Harf [Entered: 04/14/2022 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00063-JPJ-PMS. Mailed to: Darrell Jordan Getman, HALPERIN LAW CENTER, Suite 100, 4435 Waterfront Drive, Glen Allen, VA 23060. [1001139081] [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/01/2022 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00063-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: NaeemahSims. [1001139070] [22-1360] NRS [Entered: 04/01/2022 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian Friedman Harf