Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 06:29:14 (UTC).

Digital Media Solutions, LLC, et al v. South Univ of Ohio, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Digital Media Solutions, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against South Univ of Ohio, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3058

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGITAL MEDIA SOLUTIONS, LLC

Appellants

PHIL WEISER, Colorado Attorney General

KWAME RAOUL, Illinois Attorney General

Defendant

SOUTH UNIVERSITY OF OHIO, LLC, et al, dba South University

Appellee and Not Classified By Court

MARK E. DOTTORE

Intervenor / Appellee

STUDIO ENTERPRISE MANAGER, LLC

Interested Party

ARTS INSTITUTES INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Richard Huszagh

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General Office

100 W. Randolph Street, 12Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Sarah A. Hunger

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

100 W. Randolph Street, 12Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Appellee Attorney

Robert T. Glickman

Attorney at McCarthy, Lebit, Crystal & Liffman

101 Prospect Avenue, W., Suite 1800

Cleveland, OH 44115

Intervenor / Appellee Attorneys

M. Colette Gibbons

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins

600 Superior Avenue, E., Suite 2100

Cleveland, OH 44114

Adam Christopher Smith

Attorney at McDonald Hopkins

600 Superior Avenue, E., Suite 2100

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STATUS REPORT filed. Next status report due TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 04/08/2020. (MLB) [Entered: 03/09/2020 01:22 PM]

#17

(#17) MEDIATOR LETTER SENT granting motion to stay other court proceeding [ # 15 ] filed by Ms. Sarah A. Hunger; to hold appeal in abeyance pending mediation. A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 03/09/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/06/2020 04:38 PM]

#15

(#15) MOTION filed by Ms. Sarah A. Hunger for Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser to stay U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit proceeding. Certificate of Service: 02/03/2020. [20-3058] (SAH) [Entered: 02/03/2020 03:51 PM]

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. M. Colette Gibbons for Appellee Studio Enterprise Manager, LLC Certificate of Service: 01/30/2020. [20-3058] (MCG) [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:52 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Studio Enterprise Manager, LLC by M. Colette Gibbons. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2020. [20-3058] (MCG) [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:25 AM]

#10

(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Sarah A. Hunger for Appellants Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser. Certificate of Service:01/29/2020. [20-3058] (SAH) [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:55 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser by Sarah A. Hunger. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2020. [20-3058] (SAH) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:39 PM]

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#11

(#16) Letter sent regarding MEDIATION: The Telephone Mediation conference currently scheduled for 02/10/2020 with Rod McFaull is hereby canceled. [Please open notice for important details.] [20-3053, 20-3058, 20-3059] (LMR) [Entered: 02/06/2020 04:29 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser. Transcript needed: y. (PJE) [Entered: 01/14/2020 08:54 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/10/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [20-3053, 20-3058, 20-3059] (LMR) [Entered: 01/15/2020 01:38 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STATUS REPORT filed. Next status report due TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 04/08/2020. (MLB) [Entered: 03/09/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEDIATOR LETTER SENT granting motion to stay other court proceeding [ # 15 ] filed by Ms. Sarah A. Hunger; to hold appeal in abeyance pending mediation. A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 03/09/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/06/2020 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Letter sent regarding MEDIATION: The Telephone Mediation conference currently scheduled for 02/10/2020 with Rod McFaull is hereby canceled. [Please open notice for important details.] [20-3053, 20-3058, 20-3059] (LMR) [Entered: 02/06/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION filed by Ms. Sarah A. Hunger for Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser to stay U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit proceeding. Certificate of Service: 02/03/2020. [20-3058] (SAH) [Entered: 02/03/2020 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ***LOCKED*** MOTION filed by Ms. Sarah A. Hunger for Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser for stay of appeal pending settlement negotiations Certificate of Service: 02/03/2020. [20-3058] COUNSEL kindly advised to refile motion using correct relief: (stay other court proceedings) and correct motion to remove parties named that are not appelless on appeal.--[Edited 02/03/2020 by PJE] (SAH) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. M. Colette Gibbons for Appellee Studio Enterprise Manager, LLC Certificate of Service: 01/30/2020. [20-3058] (MCG) [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Studio Enterprise Manager, LLC by M. Colette Gibbons. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2020. [20-3058] (MCG) [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#11) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Ms. Sarah A. Hunger for Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser. Certificate of Service: 01/29/2020. [20-3058] (SAH) [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Sarah A. Hunger for Appellants Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser. Certificate of Service:01/29/2020. [20-3058] (SAH) [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser by Sarah A. Hunger. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2020. [20-3058] (SAH) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ****LOCKED* CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. M. Colette Gibbons for Appellee Arts Institutes International, LLC Certificate of Service: 01/28/2020. [20-3058] Counsel kindly advised to refile form listing, Studio Enterprise Manager, LLC only as the appellee--[Edited 01/29/2020 by PJE] (MCG) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***LOCKED*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Arts Institutes International, LLC, Studio Enterprise Manager, LLC and South University of Ohio, LLC by M. Colette Gibbons. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2020. [20-3058] COUNSEL kindly advised to refile form for appellee, Studio Enterprise Manager LLC only--[Edited 01/29/2020 by PJE] (MCG) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***LOCKED*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. M. Colette Gibbons for Appellee Arts Institutes International, LLC Certificate of Service: 01/28/2020. [20-3058] Counsel kindly advised to refile corporate disclosure with appellees only listed--[Edited 01/28/2020 by PJE] (MCG) [Entered: 01/28/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***LOCKED**** APPEARANCE filed for South University of Ohio, LLC and Appellees Studio Enterprise Manager, LLC and Arts Institutes International, LLC by M. Colette Gibbons. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2020. [20-3058] COUNSEL kindly advised to refile appearance form and list only appellees on appeal - please refer to the case caption of this Court.--[Edited 01/28/2020 by PJE] (MCG) [Entered: 01/28/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/10/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [20-3053, 20-3058, 20-3059] (LMR) [Entered: 01/15/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 01/15/2020 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 01/14/2020 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Kwame Raoul and Phil Weiser. Transcript needed: y. (PJE) [Entered: 01/14/2020 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Studio Enterprise Manager, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where South University of Ohio LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Digital Media Solutions LLC is a litigant