This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2019 at 06:05:22 (UTC).

Digital Ally, Inc. v. Taser International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 Digital Ally, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Taser International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2065

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

TASER INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

DIGITAL ALLY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

B. Trent Webb

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

John D. Garretson Esq.

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Pamela Beth Petersen

Attorney at Axon Enterprise, Inc.

17800 North 85Th Street

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

Lauren Elizabeth Douville

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Adam Prescott Seitz

Attorney at Erise IP, P.A.

7015 College Boulevard, Suite 700

Overland Park, KS 66211

Paul R. Hart

Attorney at Erise IP

5600 Greenwood Plaza Boulevard, Suite 200

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

7 #1

Certificate of Interest

7 #2

Attachment A

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Lauren Douville as of counsel for Appellee Taser International, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623727] [19-2065] [Lauren Douville] [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for John Garretson as of counsel for Appellee Taser International, Inc.. Service: 07/25/2019 by email. [623614] [19-2065] [John Garretson] [Entered: 07/25/2019 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Taser International, Inc.. Service: 07/11/2019 by clerk. [620445] [19-2065] [Pamela Petersen] [Entered: 07/11/2019 07:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • (#8) Notice to counsel for Appellee Taser International, Inc.: The record of this case indicates that the Docketing Statement has not been filed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [620408] [TAM] [Entered: 07/11/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Digital Ally, Inc.. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [620131] [19-2065] [Adam Seitz] [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Digital Ally, Inc.. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [620130] [19-2065] [Adam Seitz] [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Taser International, Inc. Service: 07/10/2019 by clerk. [620129] [19-2065] --[Edited 07/12/2019 by CAB to add party filer] [Pamela Petersen] [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Pamela B. Petersen as principal counsel for Appellee Taser International, Inc.. Service: 07/10/2019 by clerk. [620127] [19-2065]--[Edited 07/12/2019 by TAM to correct docket text] [Pamela Petersen] [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Paul R. Hart as of counsel for Appellant Digital Ally, Inc.. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [620123] [19-2065] [Paul Hart] [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Adam P. Seitz as principal counsel for Appellant Digital Ally, Inc.. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [620122] [19-2065] [Adam Seitz] [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/24/2019. [616963] Entry of Appearance due 07/10/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/10/2019. Docketing Statement due 07/10/2019. Appellant's brief is due 08/26/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 06/26/2019 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Digital Ally, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TASER INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Redmond Hart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Prescott Seitz