This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 06:24:57 (UTC).

Diaz v. Commissioner of Social Securit

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Diaz filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Securit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1585

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Mayra M. Diaz

Newburgh, NY 12550

Defendant / Appellee

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mayra M. Diaz

8 Grand Street

Newburgh, NY 12550

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Benjamin H. Torrance

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#31

RESTRICTED

#30

(#30) ORDER, dated 06/25/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/16/2020, unless Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870568] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:49 AM]

#29

(#29) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, MOTION, to extend time, [ # 8 ], from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870550] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:42 AM]

#28

(#28) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [17], from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870549] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:38 AM]

#27

(#27) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Mayra M. Diaz , MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION, to reaffirm, [ # 7 ], [18],[18], from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870545] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:34 AM]

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

16 #2

Supporting Document

16 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) LETTER, dated 07/02/2020, on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, requesting that the Court review for an alternate and just determination, RECEIVED. No service date.[2879003] [20-1585] [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER, dated 06/25/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/16/2020, unless Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870568] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, MOTION, to extend time, [ # 8 ], from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870550] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [17], from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870549] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Mayra M. Diaz , MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION, to reaffirm, [ # 7 ], [18],[18], from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870545] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION, to reaffirm, [18],[18], on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2852237] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/02/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [17], on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2852217] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/02/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security, FILED. Service date 06/01/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2851987] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/01/2020 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#18) MOTION, to reaffirm, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, FILED. Service date 05/26/2020 by US mail.[2852213] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/02/2020 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Mayra M. Diaz, FILED. No service date.[2852203] [20-1585] [Entered: 06/02/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER, dated 05/29/2020, dismissing appeal by 06/19/2020, unless Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2850702] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/29/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2842147] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to extend time, [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2842136] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 7 ], on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2842124] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#8) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, FILED. No service date.[2842121] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#7) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, FILED. No service date.[2842117] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2842107] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2842096] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2842094] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mayra M. Diaz, FILED. [2842093] [20-1585] [Entered: 05/19/2020 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin H. Torrance