This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/02/2022 at 06:16:34 (UTC).

Diana Mey v. DIRECTV, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Diana Mey filed an Other lawsuit against DIRECTV, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1274

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendants

AC1 COMMUNICATIONS, a DirecTV Authorized Dealer, and its principal Adam Cox

MICHAEL ASGHARI

KREATAMOTIVE LLC, a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

CDS V1, LLC, d/b/a Complete Digital Solutions, a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

XCITE SATELLITE, LLC, a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

BIRJU, LLC, a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

EXPLOSIVE SALES MARKETING GROUP, INC., a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

MYLAN JOHNSON GROUP, a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

ADAM COX

EXACT ESTIMATING, LLC, a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

FATI TECH LLC

CLEAR HOME, INC., a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

PRO EDGE MARKETING SERVICE LLC, a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

PERFECTVISION MANUFACTURING, INC., a DirecTV Authorized Dealer

Plaintiff / Appellees

RUSSELL LOCKE

THOMAS STARK, individually and on behalf of a class of all persons and entities similarly situated

STEWART ABRAMSON

DIANA MEY

CRAIG CUNNINGHAM

Defendant / Appellant

DIRECTV, LLC

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

John William Barrett

Edward A. Broderick

Linnet Rose Davis-Stermitz

Matthew P. McCue

Anthony I. Paronich

Neil Kumar Sawhney

Matthew W. H. Wessler

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Hans J. Germann

Daniel E. Jones

Carmen N. Longoria-Green

Archis Ashok Parasharami

Evan Mark Tager

 

Court Documents

#63

(#63) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. [1001129281] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 03/16/2022 04:51 PM]

#61

(#61) ORDER filed dismissing appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). [61] Copies to all parties. [1001129247] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 03/16/2022 04:38 PM]

60 #2

Exhibit A - District Court Order

60 #1

Status report

#59

(#59) STATUS REPORT FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to DIRECTV, LLC and Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, Diana Mey, James Shelton, Thomas Stark, David Vance and Roxy Vance. Re: [ # 58 ] court Order. [1001128233] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 03/15/2022 02:24 PM]

#58

(#58) COURT ORDER filed remanding case to district court for limited purpose [4cca retains jurisdiction] letter [ # 57 ]. Status report deadline: 03/14/2022 and every 30 days thereafter. Copies to all parties. [1001109238] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:47 PM]

57 #2

Additional Document

57 #1

Letter

#55

(#55) COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 45 ] Copies to all parties. [1001087707] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 01/06/2022 03:55 PM]

#9

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. [1001129281] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 03/16/2022 04:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ORDER filed dismissing appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). [61] Copies to all parties. [1001129247] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 03/16/2022 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) STATUS REPORT by DIRECTV, LLC. [1001128965] [21-1274] Archis Parasharami [Entered: 03/16/2022 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) STATUS REPORT FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to DIRECTV, LLC and Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, Diana Mey, James Shelton, Thomas Stark, David Vance and Roxy Vance. Re: [ # 58 ] court Order. [1001128233] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 03/15/2022 02:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) COURT ORDER filed remanding case to district court for limited purpose [4cca retains jurisdiction] letter [ # 57 ]. Status report deadline: 03/14/2022 and every 30 days thereafter. Copies to all parties. [1001109238] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Letter re: [ # 55 ] court Order by Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, Roxy Vance, David Vance, Thomas Stark, James Shelton and Diana Mey . [1001104105] [21-1274] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 02/03/2022 04:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE ISSUED to DIRECTV, LLC and Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, Diana Mey, James Shelton, Thomas Stark, David Vance and Roxy Vance requesting status report. [1001100662] Status report due 02/28/2022 [21-1274] CP [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 45 ] Copies to all parties. [1001087707] [21-1274] CP [Entered: 01/06/2022 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) REPLY by Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, James Shelton, Diana Mey, Thomas Stark, David Vance and Roxy Vance to response [ # 52 ], Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 45 ].. [1001084280] [21-1274] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 01/03/2022 11:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Letter re: [ # 52 ] response, [ # 45 ] Motion by Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, Roxy Vance, Diana Mey, Thomas Stark, James Shelton and David Vance . [1001081165] [21-1274] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 12/27/2021 05:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Evan M. Tager for DIRECTV, LLC. [1000926833] [21-1274] Evan Tager [Entered: 03/31/2021 05:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Hans Germann for DIRECTV, LLC. [1000926831] [21-1274] Hans Germann [Entered: 03/31/2021 04:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Archis A. Parasharami for DIRECTV, LLC. [1000926828] [21-1274] Archis Parasharami [Entered: 03/31/2021 04:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, Diana Mey, James Shelton, Thomas Stark, David Vance and Roxy Vance. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000920173] [21-1274] John Barrett [Entered: 03/22/2021 10:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, Diana Mey, James Shelton, Thomas Stark, David Vance and Roxy Vance. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000920120] [21-1274] --[Edited 03/22/2021 by MR] John Barrett [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John W. Barrett for Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, Diana Mey, James Shelton, Thomas Stark, David Vance and Roxy Vance. [1000918885] [21-1274] John Barrett [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/27/2021. Response Brief due 05/27/2021 [21-1274] MR [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM.. [21-1274] MR [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew W.H. Wessler for Diana Mey, Stewart Abramson, Craig Cunningham, Russell Locke, James Shelton, Thomas Stark, David Vance and Roxy Vance. [1000918808] [21-1274] Deepak Gupta [Entered: 03/18/2021 01:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. Case manager: MRadday. [21-1274] MR [Entered: 03/15/2021 10:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less