This case was last updated from PACER on 07/30/2019 at 06:05:33 (UTC).

Diana Hedley, et al v. DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 Diana Hedley filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Orthopedics, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3508

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

In re: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. ASR HIP IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Defendant / Appellees

JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.

DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LTD.

DEPUY ORTHOPEDICS, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

DEPUY, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL

Plaintiff / Appellants

MALCOLM S. HEDLEY

DIANA C. HEDLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin C. Sasse

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Kristen L. Mayer

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Robert C. Tucker

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Susan M. Sharko

Attorney at Drinker, Biddle & Reath

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey L. Haberman

Attorney at Schlesinger Law Offices

1212 S.E. Third Avenue

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33316

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse for DePuy International Ltd., DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. to consolidate cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. Certificate of Service: 06/18/2019. [19-3508] (BCS) [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:18 AM]

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Appellants Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] (JLH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 06:57 PM]

#12

(#12) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Appellants Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley. Certificate of Service:06/13/2019. [19-3508] (JLH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 05:53 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley by Jeffrey L. Haberman. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] (JLH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:30 PM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen L. Mayer for Appellee Johnson & Johnson. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] --[Edited 06/13/2019 by JC] (KLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:31 PM]

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen L. Mayer for Appellee Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] --[Edited 06/13/2019 by JC] (KLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:31 PM]

#15

(#16) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate [ # 6198339-2 ] [ # 6198342-2 ] [ # 6198345-2 ] [ # 6198350-2 ] [ # 6198354-2 ] [ # 6198359-2 ] [ # 6198362-2 ] [ # 15 ] [ # 6198365-2 ] [ # 6198368-2 ] [ # 6198371-2 ] [ # 6198372-2 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse. To consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:42 AM]

#15

(#16) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate [ # 6198339-2 ] [ # 6198342-2 ] [ # 6198345-2 ] [ # 6198350-2 ] [ # 6198354-2 ] [ # 6198359-2 ] [ # 6198362-2 ] [ # 15 ] [ # 6198365-2 ] [ # 6198368-2 ] [ # 6198371-2 ] [ # 6198372-2 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse. To consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:42 AM]

#16

(#16) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate [ # 6198339-2 ] [ # 6198342-2 ] [ # 6198345-2 ] [ # 6198350-2 ] [ # 6198354-2 ] [ # 6198359-2 ] [ # 6198362-2 ] [ # 15 ] [ # 6198365-2 ] [ # 6198368-2 ] [ # 6198371-2 ] [ # 6198372-2 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse. To consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:42 AM]

#15

(#16) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate [ # 6198339-2 ] [ # 6198342-2 ] [ # 6198345-2 ] [ # 6198350-2 ] [ # 6198354-2 ] [ # 6198359-2 ] [ # 6198362-2 ] [ # 15 ] [ # 6198365-2 ] [ # 6198368-2 ] [ # 6198371-2 ] [ # 6198372-2 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse. To consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:42 AM]

#16

(#16) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate [ # 6198339-2 ] [ # 6198342-2 ] [ # 6198345-2 ] [ # 6198350-2 ] [ # 6198354-2 ] [ # 6198359-2 ] [ # 6198362-2 ] [ # 15 ] [ # 6198365-2 ] [ # 6198368-2 ] [ # 6198371-2 ] [ # 6198372-2 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse. To consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:42 AM]

#16

(#16) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate [ # 6198339-2 ] [ # 6198342-2 ] [ # 6198345-2 ] [ # 6198350-2 ] [ # 6198354-2 ] [ # 6198359-2 ] [ # 6198362-2 ] [ # 15 ] [ # 6198365-2 ] [ # 6198368-2 ] [ # 6198371-2 ] [ # 6198372-2 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse. To consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:42 AM]

#20

(#20) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 19 ] filed by Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/28/2019. appellee brief now due 09/27/2019. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:12 AM]

#19

(#19) MOTION filed by Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for David Boal and Linda Boal in 19-3494, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Carolina Burrows and Colin M. Burrows in 19-3501, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Gwyneth A. Castaneda in 19-3503, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Margaret E. Coleman in 19-3504, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Norma Courage and Thomas G. Courage in 19-3505, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Terence Cranmer and Audrey Cranmer in 19-3506, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Edna J. Evans in 19-3507, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley in 19-3508, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Brian Hollowell and Lydia Hollowell in 19-3510, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Gay Searles in 19-3511, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for William A. Stephenson and Christine Stephenson in 19-3512, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Jose A. Vinuales Villar in 19-3513 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/15/2019. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JLH) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:44 PM]

#17

(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/29/2019;. appellee brief due 08/27/2019; [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:46 AM]

16 #2

Clerk Order

16 #1

Cover Letter

#15

(#16) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate [ # 6198339-2 ] [ # 6198342-2 ] [ # 6198345-2 ] [ # 6198350-2 ] [ # 6198354-2 ] [ # 6198359-2 ] [ # 6198362-2 ] [ # 15 ] [ # 6198365-2 ] [ # 6198368-2 ] [ # 6198371-2 ] [ # 6198372-2 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse. To consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:42 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 19 ] filed by Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/28/2019. appellee brief now due 09/27/2019. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION filed by Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for David Boal and Linda Boal in 19-3494, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Carolina Burrows and Colin M. Burrows in 19-3501, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Gwyneth A. Castaneda in 19-3503, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Margaret E. Coleman in 19-3504, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Norma Courage and Thomas G. Courage in 19-3505, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Terence Cranmer and Audrey Cranmer in 19-3506, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Edna J. Evans in 19-3507, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley in 19-3508, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Brian Hollowell and Lydia Hollowell in 19-3510, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Gay Searles in 19-3511, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for William A. Stephenson and Christine Stephenson in 19-3512, Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Jose A. Vinuales Villar in 19-3513 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/15/2019. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JLH) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/29/2019;. appellee brief due 08/27/2019; [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate [ # 6198339-2 ] [ # 6198342-2 ] [ # 6198345-2 ] [ # 6198350-2 ] [ # 6198354-2 ] [ # 6198359-2 ] [ # 6198362-2 ] [ # 15 ] [ # 6198365-2 ] [ # 6198368-2 ] [ # 6198371-2 ] [ # 6198372-2 ] filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse. To consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. [19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, 19-3513] (JC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION filed by Mr. Benjamin C. Sasse for DePuy International Ltd., DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. to consolidate cases 19-3494, 19-3501, 19-3503, 19-3504, 19-3505, 19-3506, 19-3507, 19-3508, 19-3510, 19-3511, 19-3512, and 19-3513. Certificate of Service: 06/18/2019. [19-3508] (BCS) [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] (JLH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 07:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Appellants Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] (JLH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 06:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey L. Haberman for Appellants Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley. Certificate of Service:06/13/2019. [19-3508] (JLH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley by Jeffrey L. Haberman. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] (JLH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen L. Mayer for Appellee Johnson & Johnson. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] --[Edited 06/13/2019 by JC] (KLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen L. Mayer for Appellee Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] --[Edited 06/13/2019 by JC] (KLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen L. Mayer for Appellee Johnson & Johnson International. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] --[Edited 06/13/2019 by JC] (KLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen L. Mayer for Appellee DePuy Orthopedics, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] --[Edited 06/13/2019 by JC] (KLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen L. Mayer for Appellee DePuy International Ltd. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] --[Edited 06/13/2019 by JC] (KLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen L. Mayer for Appellee DePuy, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2019. [19-3508] --[Edited 06/13/2019 by JC] (KLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees DePuy International Ltd., DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. by Kristen L. Mayer. Certificate of Service: 06/07/2019. [19-3508] (KLM) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees DePuy International Ltd., DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. by Benjamin C. Sasse'. Certificate of Service: 06/06/2019. [19-3508] (BCS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JC) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Diana C. Hedley and Malcolm S. Hedley. Transcript needed: n. (JC) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less