This case was last updated from PACER on 03/24/2020 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

Diana Bond v. Nueces County, Texas, et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Diana Bond filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nueces County, Texas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-40050

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHRIS GOMEZ

MICHAEL ALVAREZ

WELLPATH L.L.C.

NUECES COUNTY, TEXAS

JOSE RODRIGUEZ

JOHN #2 DOE, Individually

JANE #2 DOE, Individually

JANE #1 DOE, Individually

JOSE AGUAYO

JASMINE DRAKE

JACKIE BLEVINS

ELIZABETH ALVARDO

ANTHONY MUNOZ

JOHN #1 DOE, Individually

LUIS RIVERA

Plaintiff / Appellant

DIANA BOND, as Representative/Heir of the Estate of Tami Bond and as next friend for A.R.B.., a minor child

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jenny Cron

Attorney at County Attorney's Office

901 Leopard Street

Corpus Christi, TX 78401-3689

Nichol L. Bunn

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Calvin Trey Scott

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Christopher John Gale

Attorney at Gale Law Group

P.O. Box 2591

Corpus Christi, TX 78403

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to file brief out of time filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond [ # 9275579-2 ]; granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond [ # 9275581-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/17/2020 for Appellant Diana Bond [20-40050] (CAG) [Entered: 03/20/2020 08:08 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond to extend time to file brief as appellant until 04/17/2020 [9275581-2]. Date of service: 03/19/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bunn, Cron, Overman, Scott, Vela; Attorney for Appellant: Gale [20-40050] (Christopher John Gale ) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:23 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file brief out of time [9275579-2] - Brief Tendered? No. Date of service: 03/19/2020 [20-40050] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond to file out of time [9275579-2]. Date of service: 03/19/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bunn, Cron, Overman, Scott, Vela; Attorney for Appellant: Gale [20-40050] (Christopher John Gale ) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40050] (Patrick Overman ) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:31 AM]

Open Document

Attorney Mrs. Nichol L. Bunn for Appellees Wellpath L.L.C. and Ms. Jackie Blevins is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: Multiple forms attached. Each attorney must file his/her own form separately. [20-40050] (LBM) [Entered: 02/20/2020 03:57 PM]

Open Document #2

Explanation of Amendment

Open Document #1

Amended Attorney Appearance Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40050] (Melissa Diane Vela ) [Entered: 02/18/2020 05:49 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40050] (Nichol L. Bunn ) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:49 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40050] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:05 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/18/2020 for Appellant Diana Bond. [20-40050] (DDL) [Entered: 02/07/2020 09:30 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9240754-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-40050] (JMW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:38 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [20-40050] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Diana Bond advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 01/26/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bunn, Cron, Scott; Attorney for Appellant: Gale [20-40050] (Christopher John Gale ) [Entered: 01/26/2020 10:21 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40050] (Christopher John Gale ) [Entered: 01/26/2020 10:18 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond [20-40050] (DMS) [Entered: 01/24/2020 09:40 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to file brief out of time filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond [ # 9275579-2 ]; granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond [ # 9275581-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/17/2020 for Appellant Diana Bond [20-40050] (CAG) [Entered: 03/20/2020 08:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond to extend time to file brief as appellant until 04/17/2020 [9275581-2]. Date of service: 03/19/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bunn, Cron, Overman, Scott, Vela; Attorney for Appellant: Gale [20-40050] (Christopher John Gale ) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file brief out of time [9275579-2] - Brief Tendered? No. Date of service: 03/19/2020 [20-40050] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond to file out of time [9275579-2]. Date of service: 03/19/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bunn, Cron, Overman, Scott, Vela; Attorney for Appellant: Gale [20-40050] (Christopher John Gale ) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Patrick Overman for party(s) Appellee Elizabeth Alvardo Appellee Chris Gomez Appellee Jose Aguayo Appellee Michael Alvarez Appellee Nueces County, Texas Appellee Jasmine Drake Appellee Luis Rivera Appellee Jose Rodriguez Appellee Anthony Munoz, in case 20-40050 [20-40050] (ABT) [Entered: 03/18/2020 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40050] (Patrick Overman ) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Mrs. Nichol L. Bunn for Appellees Wellpath L.L.C. and Ms. Jackie Blevins is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: Multiple forms attached. Each attorney must file his/her own form separately. [20-40050] (LBM) [Entered: 02/20/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40050] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Melissa Diane Vela for Appellees Elizabeth Alvardo, Chris Gomez, Jose Aguayo, Michael Alvarez, Nueces County, Texas, Jasmine Drake, Luis Rivera, Jose Rodriguez and Anthony Munoz, in case 20-40050. [20-40050] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/19/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40050] (Melissa Diane Vela ) [Entered: 02/18/2020 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Nichol L. Bunn for Appellee Wellpath L.L.C. in 20-40050, Attorney Calvin Trey Scott for Appellee Jackie Blevins in 20-40050, by Attorney(s) Calvin Trey Scott, Nichol L. Bunn for party(s) Appellee Wellpath L.L.C. Appellee Jackie Blevins, in case 20-40050 [20-40050] (ABT) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40050] (Nichol L. Bunn ) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40050] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/18/2020 for Appellant Diana Bond. [20-40050] (DDL) [Entered: 02/07/2020 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-40050] (DDL) [Entered: 02/07/2020 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:19-CV-43. Electronic ROA due on 02/14/2020. [20-40050] (JMW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9240754-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-40050] (JMW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Christopher John Gale for Appellant Diana Bond in 20-40050 [20-40050] (CB) [Entered: 01/27/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [20-40050] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Diana Bond advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 01/26/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bunn, Cron, Scott; Attorney for Appellant: Gale [20-40050] (Christopher John Gale ) [Entered: 01/26/2020 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40050] (Christopher John Gale ) [Entered: 01/26/2020 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Diana Bond [20-40050] (DMS) [Entered: 01/24/2020 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wellpath LLC is a litigant