This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2021 at 06:37:20 (UTC).

DH Long Point Management LLC v. NLRB

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 DH Long Point Management LLC filed an Other lawsuit against NLRB. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1030

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DH Long Point Management LLC

Respondent

National Labor Relations Board

Intervenor

Unite Here Local 11

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul X. Rosenberg

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10111

Mark W. DeLaquil

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Washington Square, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036-5304

Respondent Attorneys

Michael Randall Hickson

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20570

David S. Habenstreit

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20570

Elizabeth Ann Heaney Esquire

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20570

Ruth E. Burdick

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20570

Intervenor Attorney

Jeremy Blasi

Attorney at Unite Here Local 11

464 South Lucas Avenue, Suite 201

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Garland and Wilkins. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:54 AM]

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1872669] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Petitioner - 15 Minutes, Respondent - 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 11/30/2020 [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:22 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1866623] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 12/04/2020. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 10/16/2020 10:30 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1865888] filed granting petitioner's motion to lodge with the Court the General Counsel's answering brief to the company's exceptions [ # 1863995-2 ]. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 10/13/2020 12:02 PM]

Open Document

LETTER [1865707] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by NLRB in 20-1030, 20-1096 [Service Date: 10/09/2020 ] [20-1030, 20-1096] (Hickson, Michael) [Entered: 10/09/2020 03:13 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1863995] to lodge with the Court the General Counsel's answering brief to the Company's exceptions filed by DH Long Point Management LLC in 20-1030, 20-1096 (Service Date: 09/29/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 173. [20-1030, 20-1096] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:40 PM]

Open Document

PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1862686] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC in 20-1030, 20-1096 [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,489. [20-1030, 20-1096]--[MODIFIED EVENT--Edited 09/22/2020 by LMC] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:42 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1862659] filed granting the motion of the National Labor Relations Board to lodge with the Court the company's brief in support of its exceptions [ # 1857915-2 ]. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:40 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1862659] filed granting the motion of the National Labor Relations Board to lodge with the Court the company's brief in support of its exceptions [ # 1857915-2 ]. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:40 PM]

Open Document #2

Board Decision

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1833651] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [20-1030] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:13 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1833648] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [20-1030] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:11 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1833643] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [20-1030] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:08 PM]

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Entry of Appearance Filed

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1828704] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 03/30/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 03/16/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 03/16/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 03/30/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 03/30/2020 [20-1030] [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:57 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1828699] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1828696-2 ] [20-1030] [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:54 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1828699] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1828696-2 ] [20-1030] [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:54 PM]

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Garland and Wilkins. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Mark W. DeLaquil, on behalf of Petitioner DH Long Point Management LLC in 20-1030, Respondent DH Long Point Management LLC in 20-1096 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-1030, 20-1096] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Michael Hickson, on behalf of Respondent NLRB in 20-1030, Petitioner NLRB in 20-1096 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-1030, 20-1096] (Hickson, Michael) [Entered: 11/24/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1872669] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Petitioner - 15 Minutes, Respondent - 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 11/30/2020 [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1866623] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 12/04/2020. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 10/16/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1865888] filed granting petitioner's motion to lodge with the Court the General Counsel's answering brief to the company's exceptions [ # 1863995-2 ]. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 10/13/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER [1865707] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by NLRB in 20-1030, 20-1096 [Service Date: 10/09/2020 ] [20-1030, 20-1096] (Hickson, Michael) [Entered: 10/09/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1863995] to lodge with the Court the General Counsel's answering brief to the Company's exceptions filed by DH Long Point Management LLC in 20-1030, 20-1096 (Service Date: 09/29/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 173. [20-1030, 20-1096] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1862686] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC in 20-1030, 20-1096 [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,489. [20-1030, 20-1096]--[MODIFIED EVENT--Edited 09/22/2020 by LMC] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1862659] filed granting the motion of the National Labor Relations Board to lodge with the Court the company's brief in support of its exceptions [ # 1857915-2 ]. [20-1030, 20-1096] [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1833660] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [20-1030] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1833654] submitted by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [20-1030] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1833651] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [20-1030] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1833648] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [20-1030] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1833643] filed by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [20-1030] (Rosenberg, Paul) [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1832480] filed by David Habenstreit and co-counsel Elizabeth Heaney and Rebecca Johnston on behalf of Respondent NLRB. [20-1030] (Habenstreit, David) [Entered: 03/09/2020 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1828704] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 03/16/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 03/30/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 03/16/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 03/16/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 03/30/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 03/30/2020 [20-1030] [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1828699] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1828696-2 ] [20-1030] [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1828696] of a decision by federal agency filed by DH Long Point Management LLC [Service Date: 02/12/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1030] [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1030] [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Labor Relations Board is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite Here! Local 30 is a litigant

Latest cases where DH LONG POINT MANAGEMENT LLC DBA TERRANEA RESORT; A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant