This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/14/2022 at 06:13:40 (UTC).

Dexcom, Inc., et al v. Medtronic, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Dexcom, Inc , filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55073

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant

DOES, 1-20

Plaintiff / Appellants

DEXCOM, INC., a Delaware corporation

CHARLES BOYKIN

Defendant / Appellee

MEDTRONIC, INC., a Minnesota corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brook Barnes

Kendra J. Hall

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Kurt Alan Kappes

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Charles Boykin and Dexcom, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/20/2022. [12346250] [22-55073] (Hall, Kendra) [Entered: 01/20/2022 02:47 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/18/2022, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12348953] (CL) [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:19 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/06/2022, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12375302] (CL) [Entered: 02/18/2022 04:36 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/06/2022, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12375302] (CL) [Entered: 02/18/2022 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/18/2022, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12348953] (CL) [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/20/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12346631]. [22-55073] (AD) [Entered: 01/20/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Charles Boykin and Dexcom, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/20/2022. [12346250] [22-55073] (Hall, Kendra) [Entered: 01/20/2022 02:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Charles Boykin and Dexcom, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/20/2022. Transcript ordered by 02/11/2022. Transcript due 03/14/2022. Appellants Charles Boykin and Dexcom, Inc. opening brief due 04/22/2022. Appellee Medtronic, Inc. answering brief due 05/23/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12339823] (JMR) [Entered: 01/13/2022 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less