This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:07:17 (UTC).

Devon Sterling v. Dushan Zatecky

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Devon Sterling filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Dushan Zatecky. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1023

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

DUSHAN ZATECKY, Superintendent

Petitioner / Appellant

DEVON STERLING

Pendleton, IN 46064-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew A. Kobe

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Stephen R. Creason

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Devon Sterling

Attorney at PENDLETON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

4490 W. Reformatory Road

Pendleton, IN 46064-0000

 

Court Documents

8 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

#1

State Habeas/Appealability Denied Case

#4

(#4) Appearance form filed by Attorney Andrew A. Kobe for Appellee Dushan Zatecky. [4] [6976373] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1023]--[Edited 01/08/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Kobe, Andrew) [Entered: 01/08/2019 10:55 AM]

#3

(#3) An order has been received from the District Court dated 01/07/2019, denying a certificate of appealability. This appeal shall proceed accordingly. [3] [6976320] [19-1023] (CMD) [Entered: 01/08/2019 09:29 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #4

Fee Notice

7 #2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

#6

(#6) ORDER re: The district courts order of January 17, 2019, granting an extension of time to appeal. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal shall proceed to a determination of appellants fee status on appeal, and whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Briefing in this appeal shall continue to be SUSPENDED until further court order. DW [6979368] [19-1023] (AG) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:32 PM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

8 #2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

#9

RESTRICTED

7 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellant, on or before 01/22/2019, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. If appellant wishes to request an extension of time in which to file the notice of appeal, he should file an appropriate motion in the district court, not this court, as soon as possible. Appellants jurisdictional memorandum should include a discussion of the status of any such motion. (See order for further details). DW [6976169] [2] [6976169] [19-1023] (MM) [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:24 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed district court order dated 01/17/2019, The motion for an extension of time to file a notice of appeal is therefore, as noted above, granted in part. Because a notice of appeal has already been filed, thirteen days after its due date, the Court extends the filing deadline by thirteen days to January 3, 2019. Mr. Sterlings notice of appeal is deemed timely.. Forwarded to SCR, DW. [5] [6979043] [19-1023] (CCG) [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:31 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Prose motion filed by Appellant Devon Sterling to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [9] [6985561] [19-1023] (VG) [Entered: 02/19/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Devon Sterling leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 02/11/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 03/14/2019 for Appellant Devon Sterling [6983942] [8] [6983942] [19-1023] (AP) [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Devon Sterling leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 01/23/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/25/2019 for Appellant Devon Sterling [6979916] [7] [6979916] [19-1023] (AP) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re: The district courts order of January 17, 2019, granting an extension of time to appeal. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal shall proceed to a determination of appellants fee status on appeal, and whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Briefing in this appeal shall continue to be SUSPENDED until further court order. DW [6979368] [19-1023] (AG) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed district court order dated 01/17/2019, The motion for an extension of time to file a notice of appeal is therefore, as noted above, granted in part. Because a notice of appeal has already been filed, thirteen days after its due date, the Court extends the filing deadline by thirteen days to January 3, 2019. Mr. Sterlings notice of appeal is deemed timely.. Forwarded to SCR, DW. [5] [6979043] [19-1023] (CCG) [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Appearance form filed by Attorney Andrew A. Kobe for Appellee Dushan Zatecky. [4] [6976373] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1023]--[Edited 01/08/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Kobe, Andrew) [Entered: 01/08/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) An order has been received from the District Court dated 01/07/2019, denying a certificate of appealability. This appeal shall proceed accordingly. [3] [6976320] [19-1023] (CMD) [Entered: 01/08/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Appellant, on or before 01/22/2019, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. If appellant wishes to request an extension of time in which to file the notice of appeal, he should file an appropriate motion in the district court, not this court, as soon as possible. Appellants jurisdictional memorandum should include a discussion of the status of any such motion. (See order for further details). DW [6976169] [2] [6976169] [19-1023] (MM) [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 11/21/2018. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/18/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/18/2019 for Appellant Devon Sterling. [1] [6975680] [19-1023] (PS) [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.