This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/25/2019 at 07:51:40 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank Trust Company v. Rado Limited Partnership

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Deutsche Bank Trust Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Rado Limited Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3089

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas

Counter Claimant

Rado Limited Partnership

Amicus Curiae

American Atheists, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sesi Garimella Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

David G. Januszewski Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jenice Malecki Esq.

Attorney at Malecki Law

11 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

Eric Leslie Lewis Esq.

Attorney at Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC

1899 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#41

#40

#37

#36

#31

#28

10 #5

Exhibit 3 of Addendum A - April 25 Order

10 #4

Exhibit 2 of Addendum A - SDNY Docket

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ATTORNEY, Eric L. Lewis, [ # 37 ], in place of attorney Jenice Malecki, SUBSTITUTED.[2693542] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CURED DEFECTIVE, LETTER, [ # 40 ], [ # 41 ], on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, FILED.[2693512] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, clarifying counsel has been replaced as lead counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2693424] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [39], on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, FILED.[2693397] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docket(#39) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2693392] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2692118] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/29/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Rado Limited Partnership Brief due date as 01/09/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 01/09/2020, FILED.[2691438] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/29/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docket(#34) NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Atheists, Inc., ADDED.[2691259] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/29/2019 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, informing Court of proposed due date 01/09/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2690921] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2683046] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, FILED. Service date 10/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2677753] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/10/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, FILED. Service date 10/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2677604] [19-3089] [Entered: 10/10/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2666479] [19-3089] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 08/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2666477] [19-3089] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2666476] [19-3089] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 07/02/2019, RECEIVED.[2666475] [19-3089] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2666473] [19-3089] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 04/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2666469] [19-3089] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17668952, FILED.[2666468] [19-3089] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Rado Limited Partnership, FILED. [2666464] [19-3089] [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Atheists is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Leslie Lewis(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jenice L. Malecki