This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/29/2021 at 06:51:40 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Deutsche Bank National Trust filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15791

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as trustee under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement relating to IMPAC Secured Assets Corp., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-1

Defendants

SEVEN HILLS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC

Counter Claimant

SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC

Cross Defendant

WILLIAM C. PARKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lilith Vala Xara Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Jamie Combs

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Donna M. Wittig

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Richard Aaron Chastain

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Diana S. Ebron

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Karen Hanks

Attorney at Messner Reeves, LLP

8945 West Russell Road, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/01/2021, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12149191] (CL) [Entered: 06/21/2021 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/17/2021, 1:30 p.m. Pacific Time. (Time change only). [12144427] (CL) [Entered: 06/15/2021 10:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/17/2021, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/11/2021 ). [12142940] (CL) [Entered: 06/14/2021 09:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, in case 21-15791. [12113543] (NAC) [Entered: 05/14/2021 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama 35203) for Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Date of service: 05/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12113534] [21-15791] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 05/14/2021 01:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, in case 21-15791. [12113422] (NAC) [Entered: 05/14/2021 01:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP. 1819 Fifth Ave N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Date of service: 05/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12113349] [21-15791] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 05/14/2021 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/11/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12112739] (CL) [Entered: 05/13/2021 08:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/07/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12105917]. [21-15791] (AD) [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/07/2021. [12105554] [21-15791] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/07/2021. Transcript ordered by 06/01/2021. Transcript due 06/28/2021. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 08/09/2021. Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company answering brief due 09/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12097847] (JBS) [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seven Hills Master Community Association is a litigant

Latest cases where ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant