This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/18/2020 at 06:04:47 (UTC).

DeSheila Howlett v. City of Warren, MI, et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 DeSheila Howlett filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Warren, MI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2460

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

ANWAR KHAN

SHAWN JOHNSON

LAWRENCE GARDNER

CITY OF WARREN, MI

Plaintiff / Appellee

DESHEILA HOWLETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Ronald G. Acho

Attorney at Cummings McClorey Davis & Acho

17436 College Parkway

Livonia, MI 48152

Stanley I. Okoli

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho

17436 College Parkway

Livonia, MI 48152

James R. Acho

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho

17436 College Parkway

Livonia, MI 48152

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Leonard Mungo

Attorney at Mungo and Mungo

31700 Telegraph Road, Suite 250

Bingham Farms, MI 48025

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) REPLY filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for DeSheila Howlett regarding PLAINTIFF-APPELLEE DESHEILA C. HOWLETTS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS/APPELLANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. Certificate of Service: 01/31/2020. [19-2460] (LM) [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:20 PM]

#18

(#18) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 14 ]; previously filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for DeSheila Howlett. Response from Attorney Mr. Stanley I. Okoli for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan Certificate of Service:01/24/2020. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:58 PM]

#16

(#16) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 01/17/2020 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 01/17/2020 10:00 AM]

#15

(#15) RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance. Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pending. (KSF) [Entered: 01/17/2020 09:52 AM]

#14

(#14) MOTION filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for DeSheila Howlett to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2020. [19-2460] (LM) [Entered: 01/17/2020 08:43 AM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan by James R. Acho. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2020. [19-2460] (JRA) [Entered: 01/10/2020 08:59 AM]

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Leonard Mungo for Appellee DeSheila Howlett Certificate of Service: 12/31/2019. [19-2460] (LM) [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:15 AM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee DeSheila Howlett by Leonard Mungo. Certificate of Service: 12/31/2019. [19-2460] (LM) [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:11 AM]

#9

(#9) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/10/2020; appellee brief due 03/11/2020. (KSF) [Entered: 12/30/2019 03:23 PM]

#7

(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stanley I. Okoli for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan. Certificate of Service:12/30/2019. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:34 PM]

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stanley I. Okoli for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan Certificate of Service: 12/30/2019. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:32 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan by Stanley Okoli. Certificate of Service: 12/27/2019. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 12/27/2019 02:46 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/17/2020 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:32 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:20 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for DeSheila Howlett regarding PLAINTIFF-APPELLEE DESHEILA C. HOWLETTS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS/APPELLANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. Certificate of Service: 01/31/2020. [19-2460] (LM) [Entered: 01/31/2020 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 14 ]; previously filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for DeSheila Howlett. Response from Attorney Mr. Stanley I. Okoli for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan Certificate of Service:01/24/2020. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#17) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 01/17/2020 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 01/17/2020 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 01/17/2020 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance. Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pending. (KSF) [Entered: 01/17/2020 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for DeSheila Howlett to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2020. [19-2460] (LM) [Entered: 01/17/2020 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS MOTION TO DISMISS CASE WITH THE CORRECT SECOND RELIEF BEING FOR JURISDICTION.*** MOTION filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for DeSheila Howlett to dismiss PLAINTIFF-APPELLEE DESHEILA C. HOWLETTS MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL Certificate of Service: 01/16/2020. [19-2460]--[Edited 01/17/2020 by KSF] (LM) [Entered: 01/16/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan by James R. Acho. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2020. [19-2460] (JRA) [Entered: 01/10/2020 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Leonard Mungo for Appellee DeSheila Howlett Certificate of Service: 12/31/2019. [19-2460] (LM) [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee DeSheila Howlett by Leonard Mungo. Certificate of Service: 12/31/2019. [19-2460] (LM) [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/10/2020; appellee brief due 03/11/2020. (KSF) [Entered: 12/30/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#8) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Stanley I. Okoli for City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan. Certificate of Service: 12/30/2019. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stanley I. Okoli for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan. Certificate of Service:12/30/2019. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stanley I. Okoli for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan Certificate of Service: 12/30/2019. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan by Stanley Okoli. Certificate of Service: 12/27/2019. [19-2460] (SIO) [Entered: 12/27/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/17/2020 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants City of Warren, MI, Lawrence Gardner, Shawn Johnson and Anwar Khan. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard Mungo