This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:24:13 (UTC).

Derrick Galvin v. Wendy Kelley

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 Derrick Galvin filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Wendy Kelley. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1531

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Derrick S. Galvin

Grady, AR 71644-0600

Defendant / Appellee

Wendy Kelley, Director, ADC (originally named as Doe Warden Varner Unit)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Derrick S. Galvin

Attorney at VARNER CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

P.O. Box 600

Grady, AR 71644-0600

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #1

Documents in Support of Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 3/13/19, docket entries, Findings & Recommendation, Order 3/05/19. [4766902] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:32 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/11/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4766908] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:35 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Appeal In Froma Pauperis

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [4766890] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Complaint Information

Open Document #1

Motion for Extension of Brief Time

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 4778926-2 ] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Appellant Mr. Derrick S. Galvin. Appellant's Motion For Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is considered timely filed. [4783150] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:33 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4766917] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:38 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 4778926-2 ] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Appellant Mr. Derrick S. Galvin. Appellant's Motion For Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is considered timely filed. [4783150] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT FILED - Complaint Information filed by Mr. Derrick S. Galvin. w/service by USCA8 on 04/22/2019. [4779807] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT FILED - Documents in Support of Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Mr. Derrick S. Galvin. w/service by USCA8 on 04/22/2019 [4779804] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, filed by Appellant Mr. Derrick S. Galvin w/service by USCA8 on 04/18/2019. [4778926] [19-1531]--[Edited title of motion 05/01/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 04/18/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Appellant Mr. Derrick S. Galvin w/service by USCA8 on 04/18/2019. [4778902] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 04/18/2019 08:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4766917] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/11/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4766908] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 3/13/19, docket entries, Findings & Recommendation, Order 3/05/19. [4766902] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4766890] [19-1531] (TMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.