This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/12/2022 at 07:27:56 (UTC).

Derrick Allen, Sr. v. Amazon Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Derrick Allen, Sr filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Amazon Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1045

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DERRICK MICHAEL ALLEN, SR.

Raleigh, NC 27602

Defendant / Appellees

AMAZON CORPORATION

WOODARD & ELLIS CO. LLC

JAHI GRYE'NYANE, Human Resource Agent

JEFF BEZOS, Founder of Amazon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Derrick Michael Allen Sr.

P. O. Box 1675

Raleigh, NC 27602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00657-TDS-LPA. Case manager: ABrownlee. [1001090392] [22-1045] AB [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:27 PM]

#2

(#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001090397]. Due: 01/25/2022. [22-1045] AB [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:30 PM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001090401] Informal Opening Brief due 02/04/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-1045] AB [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:31 PM]

#5

(#5) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Derrick Michael Allen, Sr.. [1001092211] [22-1045] Derrick Allen [Entered: 01/13/2022 06:58 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Derrick Michael Allen, Sr.. [1001092211] [22-1045] Derrick Allen [Entered: 01/13/2022 06:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00657-TDS-LPA. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001090589] [22-1045] AB [Entered: 01/11/2022 06:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001090401] Informal Opening Brief due 02/04/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [22-1045] AB [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001090397]. Due: 01/25/2022. [22-1045] AB [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00657-TDS-LPA. Case manager: ABrownlee. [1001090392] [22-1045] AB [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derrick Michael Allen Sr.