Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2020 at 06:03:52 (UTC).

Derek DeYoung v. BGroup, Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Derek DeYoung filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against BGroup, Ltd . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1151

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

BGROUP, LTD., a Hong Kong limited by shares company

UNKNOWN PARTIES, named as Does 1-10

MANH QUAN TRUONG, an individual resident of Vietnam

THUY PHAN THIEN HA DONG, an individual resident of Vietnam

Defendant / Appellant

PRINTABEL COMPANY LIMITED, a Hong Kong limited by shares company

Plaintiff / Appellee

DEREK DEYOUNG, a resident of Michigan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Enrico Schaefer

Attorney at Traverse Legal

810 Cottageview Drive, Suite G-20

Traverse City, MI 49684

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

John Anthony Di Giacomo

Attorney at Law Office

109 E. Front Street, Suite 309

Traverse City, MI 49684

Amanda Marie-Anderson Osorio

Attorney at Revision Legal

451 Norwood Avenue, S.E.

Grand Rapids, MI 49506

 

Court Documents

17 #2

Clerk Order-Stipulation Dismiss R33

17 #1

Cover Letter

#16

(#16) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION:. The Mediation Conference scheduled for 03/23/2020 is hereby canceled. (MLB) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:12 PM]

#15

(#15) STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Stipulation filed by Attorney Enrico Schaefer for Appellant Printabel Company Limited. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:03 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Derek DeYoung by John Di Giacomo. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2020. [20-1151] (JAD) [Entered: 03/02/2020 01:26 PM]

13 #2

Stipulation to Dismiss

13 #1

Mediator letter sent

12 #2

Clerk Order

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Enrico Schaefer for Appellant Printabel Company Limited Certificate of Service: 02/26/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 02/26/2020 07:09 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION filed by Enrico Schaefer for Printabel Company Limited to expedite briefing schedule, to expedite oral argument. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 02/26/2020 06:59 PM]

#9

(#9) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/06/2020;. appellee brief due 05/05/2020; (RGF) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:49 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Printabel Company Limited by Enrico Schaefer. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:20 PM]

#6

(#6) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 5 ], filed by Enrico Schaefer for Printabel Company Limited is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 03/03/2020. (JE) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:43 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/23/2020 at 2:00 pm ET with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 02/21/2020 01:36 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Printabel Company Limited. Transcript needed: y. (RLJ) [Entered: 02/20/2020 01:59 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER filed granting stipulation to dismiss case - mediation [ # 15 ] filed by Enrico Schaefer. Entered by order of the court. (CAW) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION:. The Mediation Conference scheduled for 03/23/2020 is hereby canceled. (MLB) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Stipulation filed by Attorney Enrico Schaefer for Appellant Printabel Company Limited. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Derek DeYoung by John Di Giacomo. Certificate of Service: 03/02/2020. [20-1151] (JAD) [Entered: 03/02/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a brief or stipulation to dismiss is due 03/06/2020. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 03/02/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER filed granting motion to expedite briefing schedule [ # 10 ] [ # 10 ] filed by Enrico Schaefer, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/03/2020; appellee brief now due 03/13/2020. Upon completion of briefing, the appeal will be submitted to the court as soon as its schedule will permit. All further matters, including whether to conduct oral argument, are reserved to the ultimate merits panel. (RLJ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Enrico Schaefer for Appellant Printabel Company Limited Certificate of Service: 02/26/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 02/26/2020 07:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION filed by Enrico Schaefer for Printabel Company Limited to expedite briefing schedule, to expedite oral argument. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 02/26/2020 06:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/06/2020;. appellee brief due 05/05/2020; (RGF) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#8) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Enrico Schaefer for Printabel Company Limited. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Printabel Company Limited by Enrico Schaefer. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2020. [20-1151] (ES) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 5 ], filed by Enrico Schaefer for Printabel Company Limited is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 03/03/2020. (JE) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **** DEFECTIVE ENTRY: See deficiency notice (RE 6) **** APPEARANCE filed for Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong and Appellant Printabel Company Limited by Enrico Schaefer. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2020. [20-1151]--[Edited 02/25/2020 by JE] (ES) [Entered: 02/25/2020 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/23/2020 at 2:00 pm ET with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 02/21/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (CAW) [Entered: 02/21/2020 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 02/20/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Printabel Company Limited. Transcript needed: y. (RLJ) [Entered: 02/20/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Marie-Anderson Osorio