This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 06:07:43 (UTC).

Derek Christopherson, et al v. Robert Bushner, et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Derek Christopherson filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Robert Bushner. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2441

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Connie Jo Bushner

Lady Lake, FL 32159

Atkins North America, Inc.

Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc.

Inez Pahlmann

Corelogic Flood Services, LLC

Federal Emergency Management Agency

Stantec Consulting Services, Inc.

John Doe

Dewberry Engineers, Inc.

Robert Bushner

Lady Lake, FL 32159

Plaintiff / Appellants

Jennifer Christopherson

Derek Christopherson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Connie Jo Bushner

1303 Desilva Street

Lady Lake, FL 32159

Ross D. Ginsberg

Attorney at WEINBERG & WHEELER

Suite 2400, 3344 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Anna Idelevich

Attorney at WEINBERG & WHEELER

Suite 2400, 3344 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Jeffrey Joseph Brinker

Attorney at BRINKER & DOYEN

5Th Floor, 34 N. Meramec Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

Bridgette Nicole Fu

Attorney at BRINKER & DOYEN

5Th Floor, 34 N. Meramec Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

Jennifer Howell

Attorney at BRINKER & DOYEN

5Th Floor, 34 N. Meramec Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

Mark A. Olthoff

Attorney at POLSINELLI, PC

Suite 900, 900 W. 48Th Place

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Phillip James Richard Zeeck

Attorney at POLSINELLI, PC

Suite 900, 900 W. 48Th Place

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Cynthia Jean Hyde

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 500, 901 East St. Louis Street

Springfield, MO 65806-2511

Robert Bushner

1303 Desilva Street

Lady Lake, FL 32159

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nicholas Austin Fax

Attorney at LOWTHER & JOHNSON

20Th Floor, 901 St. Louis Street

Springfield, MO 65806-0000

Nicole D. Lindsey

Attorney at STUBBLEFIELD LAW, LLC.

1903 E. Battlefield Street

Springfield, MO 65804

Kory D. Stubblefield

Attorney at STUBBLEFIELD LAW, LLC.

1903 E. Battlefield Street

Springfield, MO 65804

 

Court Documents

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson - Separate Appendix - w/service 08/24/2021 [5069011] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/24/2021 03:10 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5060704-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Kory D. Stubblefield. Brief of Derek Christopherson and Jennifer Christopherson due 09/08/2021. Appendix due on 09/08/2021. [5061017] [21-2441] (MVP) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:53 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Ms. Nicole D. Lindsey for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson and Mr. Kory D. Stubblefield for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson correcting [ # 5060704-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [5060982] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:59 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 09/08/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Kory D. Stubblefield for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson w/service 08/01/2021. [5060704] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/01/2021 06:54 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Nicole D. Lindsey for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson w/service 08/01/2021 [5060702] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/01/2021 04:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Kory D. Stubblefield for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson w/service 08/01/2021 [5060701] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/01/2021 04:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Mark A. Olthoff for Appellee Corelogic Flood Services, LLC w/service 07/21/2021 [5057255] [21-2441] (MAO) [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Phillip J.R. Zeeck for Appellee Corelogic Flood Services, LLC w/service 07/21/2021 [5057217] [21-2441] (PJZ) [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jennifer Howell for Appellees Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc. and Inez Pahlmann w/service 07/19/2021 [5056266] [21-2441] (JH) [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:07 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Stantec Consulting Services, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5052789] [21-2441] (AI) [Entered: 07/07/2021 04:30 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Dewberry Engineers, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5052788] [21-2441] (AI) [Entered: 07/07/2021 04:29 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Atkins North America, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5052787] [21-2441] (AI) [Entered: 07/07/2021 04:27 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Ross D. Ginsberg for Appellees Atkins North America, Inc., Stantec Consulting Services, Inc. and Dewberry Engineers, Inc. w/service 07/06/2021 [5051931] [21-2441] (RDG) [Entered: 07/06/2021 11:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Anna Idelevich for Appellees Atkins North America, Inc., Dewberry Engineers, Inc. and Stantec Consulting Services, Inc. w/service 07/02/2021 [5051302] [21-2441] (AI) [Entered: 07/02/2021 08:13 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Cynthia J. Hyde for Appellee FEMA w/service 06/30/2021 [5050763] [21-2441] (CJH) [Entered: 06/30/2021 01:50 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/09/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Derek Christopherson and Jennifer Christopherson due 08/09/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5050658] [21-2441] (AEV) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:13 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 4/29/21, Judgment 4/29/21, docket entries, [5050657] [21-2441] (AEV) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:12 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5050650] [21-2441] (AEV) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:09 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson - Separate Appendix - w/service 08/24/2021 [5069011] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/24/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5060704-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Kory D. Stubblefield. Brief of Derek Christopherson and Jennifer Christopherson due 09/08/2021. Appendix due on 09/08/2021. [5061017] [21-2441] (MVP) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Ms. Nicole D. Lindsey for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson and Mr. Kory D. Stubblefield for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson correcting [ # 5060704-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Attorney. [5060982] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 5060704-2 ], submitted by Mr. Kory D. Stubblefield in 21-2441 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [21-2441] (MVP) [Entered: 08/02/2021 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 09/08/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Kory D. Stubblefield for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson w/service 08/01/2021. [5060704] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/01/2021 06:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Nicole D. Lindsey for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson w/service 08/01/2021 [5060702] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/01/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Kory D. Stubblefield for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson w/service 08/01/2021 [5060701] [21-2441] (KDS) [Entered: 08/01/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Mark A. Olthoff for Appellee Corelogic Flood Services, LLC w/service 07/21/2021 [5057255] [21-2441] (MAO) [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Phillip J.R. Zeeck for Appellee Corelogic Flood Services, LLC w/service 07/21/2021 [5057217] [21-2441] (PJZ) [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jennifer Howell for Appellees Missouri Ozarks Realty, Inc. and Inez Pahlmann w/service 07/19/2021 [5056266] [21-2441] (JH) [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Kory Stubblefield for Appellants Mr. Derek Christopherson and Ms. Jennifer Christopherson w/service 07/09/2021 [5053512] [21-2441] [5053512] [21-2441]--[Edited 07/09/2021 by JPP - Reason: Mr. Stubblefield's appearance form PDF does not indicate he represents appellants Derek Christopherson and Jennifer Christopherson as docket text indicates. Attorney Ms. Nicole D. Lindsey is required to file an appearance separately from Mr. Stubblefield using separate appearance filed event.] (KDS) [Entered: 07/09/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Stantec Consulting Services, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5052789] [21-2441] (AI) [Entered: 07/07/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Dewberry Engineers, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5052788] [21-2441] (AI) [Entered: 07/07/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Atkins North America, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5052787] [21-2441] (AI) [Entered: 07/07/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Ross D. Ginsberg for Appellees Atkins North America, Inc., Stantec Consulting Services, Inc. and Dewberry Engineers, Inc. w/service 07/06/2021 [5051931] [21-2441] (RDG) [Entered: 07/06/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Anna Idelevich for Appellees Atkins North America, Inc., Dewberry Engineers, Inc. and Stantec Consulting Services, Inc. w/service 07/02/2021 [5051302] [21-2441] (AI) [Entered: 07/02/2021 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Cynthia J. Hyde for Appellee FEMA w/service 06/30/2021 [5050763] [21-2441] (CJH) [Entered: 06/30/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/09/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Derek Christopherson and Jennifer Christopherson due 08/09/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5050658] [21-2441] (AEV) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 4/29/21, Judgment 4/29/21, docket entries, [5050657] [21-2441] (AEV) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5050650] [21-2441] (AEV) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atkins North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where STANTEC CONSULTING SERVICES, INC., a Florida corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Emergency Management Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kory D. Stubblefield