This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/15/2020 at 05:30:32 (UTC).

DeNucci Constructors, L.L.C. v. OSHC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 DeNucci Constructors, L L C filed an Other lawsuit against OSHC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-60710

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DeNucci Constructors, L.L.C.

Respondents

Eugene Scalia, Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor

Occupational Safety and Health Review Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anthony David Tilton

Attorney at Cotney Construction Law, L.L.P.

150 S. Monroe Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Respondent Attorneys

Jessica Cole

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

200 Constitution Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20210

Kate S. O'Scannlain

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

200 Constitution Avenue, N.W., Frances Perkins Building

Washington, DC 20210

John X. Cerveny

Attorney at Occupational Safety & Health Review Commission

1120 20Th Street, N.W., 1 Lafayette Center

Washington, DC 20036-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60710] (Jessica Cole ) [Entered: 08/13/2020 06:32 PM]

Open Document #2

Petition for Review

Open Document #1

DKT-4 Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jessica Cole for Respondents OSHC and Eugene Scalia, Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor, in case 20-60710. [20-60710] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/14/2020 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60710] (Jessica Cole ) [Entered: 08/13/2020 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9375080-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-60710] (CB) [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGENCY CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner DeNucci Constructors, L.L.C.. Date received in 5th Circuit: 08/06/2020. Administrative Record due on 09/16/2020 [20-60710] (AGL) [Entered: 08/07/2020 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eugene Scalia, Secretary, US Department of Labor is a litigant