This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/19/2023 at 06:10:29 (UTC).

Dennis Rockwell, et al v. ASCO, L.P., et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 Dennis Rockwell, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASCO, L P ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-56198

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

 

Party Details

Defendants

AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC

CRANE CO., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to CHAPMAN VALVE CO

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.

VIACOMCBS INC.

WARREN PUMPS, LLC

METALLO GASKET CO.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

PCC FLOW TECHNOLOGIES HOLDINGS, INC., as successor-in-interest to JOHNSTON PUMP COMPANY and PACO PUMPS

CARVER PUMP COMPANY

VIKING PUMP, INC.

KEELER-DORR OLIVER BOILER COMPANY

JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.

THE WM. POWELL COMPANY, Erroneously Sued As The William Powell Company

Plaintiff / Appellants

DENNIS A. ROCKWELL

DAWN ROCKWELL

Defendant / Appellees

ASCO, L.P., Successor-in-interest to Foster Engineering, FKA ASCO Valve, Inc., FKA ASCO Valve, LLC

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Paul C. Cook

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth Carpenter

Daniel R. Baltes

Bina Ghanaat Esquire

Edward R. Hugo Esquire

Charles S. Park

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Additional Document

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/02/2023, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12624036] (CL) [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:07 PM]

#5

(#5) Mail returned on 01/10/2023 addressed to Gary D. Sharp, Esquire for ASCO, L.P. and Fisher Controls International, LLC, re: [ # 1 ] Case Opening Document. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; appellees are represented by co-counsel. [12628764] (QDL) [Entered: 01/11/2023 04:48 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12648502] (BLS) [Entered: 02/07/2023 04:48 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12648502] (BLS) [Entered: 02/07/2023 04:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#6) Terminated Gary D. Sharp for ASCO, L.P. and Fisher Controls International, LLC in 22-56198 [12628766] (QDL) [Entered: 01/11/2023 04:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail returned on 01/10/2023 addressed to Gary D. Sharp, Esquire for ASCO, L.P. and Fisher Controls International, LLC, re: [ # 1 ] Case Opening Document. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; appellees are represented by co-counsel. [12628764] (QDL) [Entered: 01/11/2023 04:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/02/2023, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12624036] (CL) [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/28/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12619608]. [22-56198] (AD) [Entered: 12/28/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Dawn Rockwell and Dennis A. Rockwell Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/28/2022. [12619317] [22-56198] (Cook, Paul) [Entered: 12/28/2022 02:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Dawn Rockwell and Dennis A. Rockwell Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/28/2022. Transcript ordered by 01/20/2023. Transcript due 02/21/2023. Appellants Dawn Rockwell and Dennis A. Rockwell opening brief due 03/28/2023. Appellees ASCO, L.P., Fisher Controls International, LLC, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation and Foster Wheeler LLC answering brief due 04/28/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12615988] (RT) [Entered: 12/21/2022 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less