This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:16 (UTC).

Dennis Murphy v. DHS

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Dennis Murphy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against DHS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1742

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION AGENCY

Plaintiff / Appellant

DENNIS FINBARR MURPHY

Hedgesville, WV 25427

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Erin K. Reisenweber

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

217 West King Street

Martinsburg, WV 25401-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dennis Finbarr Murphy

639 Michelle Drive

Hedgesville, WV 25427

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENT to [ # 5 ] informal opening brief by Dennis Finbarr Murphy. [1000554818] [19-1742] CB [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:13 PM]

4 #1

Disclosure of corporate affiliations

4 #2

Envelope

5 #3

Envelope

5 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

5 #2

Cover letter

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Dennis Murphy. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1742] CB [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:32 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00147-GMG-RWT. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1742] CB [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:28 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENT to [ # 5 ] informal opening brief by Dennis Finbarr Murphy. [1000554818] [19-1742] CB [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Dennis Finbarr Murphy. [19-1742] MR [Entered: 07/25/2019 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Dennis Finbarr Murphy. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000552791] [19-1742] MR [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Dennis Murphy. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1742] CB [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00147-GMG-RWT. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1742] CB [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00147-GMG-RWT. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1742] CB [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.