This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/28/2022 at 05:10:27 (UTC).

Dennis McLain v. Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 Dennis McLain filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-11667

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DENNIS MCLAIN

Defendant / Appellee

DAVID J. SHULKIN

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph D. Magri

Attorney at Merkle Magri & Meythaler, PA

5601 Mariner St Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33609-3413

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Kenneth

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Erik Kenneth Stegeby

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

David P. Sullivan

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Fort Myers, FL 33908

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Mark A. Hanley

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

ORDER DE# 251

Open Document #4

JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE DE# 255

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Dennis McLain on 05/13/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/31/2022 as to Appellant Dennis McLain. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/14/2022 as to Appellee David J. Shulkin [Entered: 05/17/2022 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Hanley