This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/25/2021 at 06:08:41 (UTC).

Denise Snyder v. Walmart, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Denise Snyder filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3989

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DENISE SNYDER, Personal Representative of the Estate of Deceased Concetta M. DeSantis

Defendant / Appellees

WALMART, INC.

WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

MPG PROPERTY GROUP, LLC

MARKETPLACE ASSOCIATES, LLC

FOUR CORNERS SHOPPING CENTER, LLC

WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kathleen J. St. John

Attorney at Nurenberg, Paris, Heller & McCarthy

600 Superior Avenue, E.Suite 1200

Cleveland, OH 44113

David T. Bright

Attorney at Sico Hoelscher Harris

802 N. Carancahuasuite 900

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Jamie R. Lebovitz

Attorney at Nurenberg, Paris, Heller & McCarthy

600 Superior Avenue, E.Suite 1200

Cleveland, OH 44113

Jordan D. Lebovitz

Attorney at Nurenberg, Paris, Heller & McCarthy

600 Superior Avenue, E.Suite 1200

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Katie L. Zorc

101 W. Prospect Avenuesuite 1400

Cleveland, OH 44115

Gregory Gordon Guice

Attorney at Reminger

2676 Sulgrave Road

Shaker Hts, OH 44122

Robert Rivera Jr.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey

1000 Louisiana Streetsuite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Matthew Colin Behncke

Attorney at Susman Godfrey

1000 Louisiana Streetsuite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas J. Cabral

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp

1215 Superior Avenueseventh Floor

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joseph Monroe II

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp

1215 Superior Avenueseventh Floor

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/28/2022. appellee brief now due 03/18/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 11/22/2021 10:10 AM]

#23

(#23) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. by Robert Rivera, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 11/10/2021. [21-3989] (RR) [Entered: 11/10/2021 05:17 PM]

#22

(#22) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/20/2021;. appellee brief due 01/19/2022; (MRL) [Entered: 11/10/2021 08:16 AM]

#21

(#21) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Gregory G. Guice. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (GGG) [Entered: 11/09/2021 06:11 PM]

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Colin Behncke for Appellees Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (MCB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:21 PM]

#18

(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Colin Behncke for Appellees Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (MCB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:20 PM]

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Colin Behncke for Appellees Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (MCB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:19 PM]

#16

(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust by Matthew C. Behncke. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (MCB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 10:43 AM]

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kathleen J. St. John for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder Certificate of Service: 10/27/2021. [21-3989] (KJS) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:45 PM]

#8

(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Kathleen J. St. John for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder.. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2021. [21-3989] (KJS) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:44 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder by Jordan D. Lebovitz. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2021. [21-3989] (JDL) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:42 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder by Jamie R. Lebovitz. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2021. [21-3989] (JRL) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:41 PM]

5 #2

form(s) sent

5 #1

Letter

#4

(#4) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:21 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder by Kathleen J. St. John. Certificate of Service: 10/26/2021. [21-3989] (KJS) [Entered: 10/26/2021 03:29 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder. Transcript needed: y. (MRL) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:17 PM]

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/28/2022. appellee brief now due 03/18/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 11/22/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. by Robert Rivera, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 11/10/2021. [21-3989] (RR) [Entered: 11/10/2021 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/20/2021;. appellee brief due 01/19/2022; (MRL) [Entered: 11/10/2021 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Gregory G. Guice. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (GGG) [Entered: 11/09/2021 06:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS AN APPEARANCE FORM***NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Gregory Gordon Guice for Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. regarding Notice of Appearance. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989]--[Edited 11/09/2021 by MRL] (GGG) [Entered: 11/09/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Colin Behncke for Appellees Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (MCB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Colin Behncke for Appellees Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (MCB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Colin Behncke for Appellees Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (MCB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust by Matthew C. Behncke. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2021. [21-3989] (MCB) [Entered: 11/09/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Four Corners Shopping Center, LLC and MPG Property Group, LLC by Thomas J. Cabral. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2021. [21-3989] (TJC) [Entered: 11/08/2021 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder by David T. Bright. Certificate of Service: 10/28/2021. [21-3989] (DTB) [Entered: 10/28/2021 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kathleen J. St. John for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder Certificate of Service: 10/27/2021. [21-3989] (KJS) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Kathleen J. St. John for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder.. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2021. [21-3989] (KJS) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder by Jordan D. Lebovitz. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2021. [21-3989] (JDL) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder by Jamie R. Lebovitz. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2021. [21-3989] (JRL) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER SENT regarding amended caption to Mr. David T. Bright for Ms. Denise Snyder, Ms. Jamie R. Lebovitz for Ms. Denise Snyder, Ms. Jordan D. Lebovitz for Ms. Denise Snyder, Ms. Kathleen J. St. John for Ms. Denise Snyder, Mr. Thomas J. Cabral for MPG Property Group, LLC and Four Corners Shopping Center, LLC, Mr. Gregory Gordon Guice for Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc., Mr. Joseph Monroe, II for MPG Property Group, LLC and Four Corners Shopping Center, LLC and Ms. Katie L. Zorc for Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc., regarding (MRL) [Entered: 10/27/2021 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder by Kathleen J. St. John. Certificate of Service: 10/26/2021. [21-3989] (KJS) [Entered: 10/26/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Michelle R. Lambert (MRL) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Denise Snyder. Transcript needed: y. (MRL) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katie Lynn Zorc