This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/03/2023 at 06:10:01 (UTC).

Deng v. Frequency Electronics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Deng filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Frequency Electronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3074

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Defendant

Ajilon Professional Staffing LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jia Deng

Defendant / Appellees

Frequency Electronics, Inc.

Ado Professional Solutions Inc., FKA Accounting Principals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Abdul Karim Hassan Esq.

Attorney at Abdul Hassan Law Group, PLLC

215-28 Hillside Avenue

Queens Village, NY 11427

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amber Rogers

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

1445 Ross Avenue

Dalas, TX 75202

Ryan C. Chapoteau Esq.

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

666 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Jason A. Zoldessy Esq.

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

666 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/14/2022, RECEIVED.[3431524] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/06/2022 09:24 AM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Frequency Electronics, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3434059] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/09/2022 12:25 PM]

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ajilon Professional Staffing LLC, FILED. Service date 12/14/2022 by CM/ECF.[3436632] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/14/2022 11:09 AM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, FILED. Service date 12/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3439059] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/17/2022 04:15 PM]

#8

(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, FILED. Service date 12/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3439060] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/17/2022 04:30 PM]

#9

(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, FILED. Service date 12/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3439061] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/17/2022 04:31 PM]

#10

(#10) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, informing Court of proposed due date 03/17/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 12/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3439062] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/17/2022 04:36 PM]

#14

(#14) CAPTION, Ado Professional Solutions Inc. party and Ajilon Professional Staffing LLC, designation, AMENDED.[3439345] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:50 AM]

#19

(#19) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/02/2023, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3439833] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/19/2022 04:44 PM]

#21

(#21) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3440549] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/20/2022 03:15 PM]

#22

(#22) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jia Deng Brief due date as 03/17/2023. Joint Appendix due date as 03/17/2023, FILED.[3440573] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/20/2022 03:29 PM]

#24

(#24) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [23], on behalf of Appellee Ado Professional Solutions Inc., FILED.[3459277] [22-3074] [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:17 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 24 ], [ # 25 ], on behalf of Appellee Ado Professional Solutions Inc., FILED.[3459686] [22-3074] [Entered: 01/27/2023 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY, Jason A Zoldessy for Ado Professional Solutions Inc., in case 22-3074, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[3459684] [22-3074] [Entered: 01/27/2023 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ado Professional Solutions Inc., FILED. Service date 01/26/2023 by CM/ECF. [3459449] [22-3074] [Entered: 01/26/2023 02:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [23], on behalf of Appellee Ado Professional Solutions Inc., FILED.[3459277] [22-3074] [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Frequency Electronics, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/26/2023 by CM/ECF. [3459257] [22-3074] [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jia Deng Brief due date as 03/17/2023. Joint Appendix due date as 03/17/2023, FILED.[3440573] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/20/2022 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3440549] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/20/2022 03:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 02/02/2023, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3439833] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/19/2022 04:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CAPTION, Ado Professional Solutions Inc. party and Ajilon Professional Staffing LLC, designation, AMENDED.[3439345] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, informing Court of proposed due date 03/17/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 12/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3439062] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/17/2022 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, FILED. Service date 12/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3439061] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/17/2022 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, FILED. Service date 12/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3439060] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/17/2022 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, FILED. Service date 12/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3439059] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/17/2022 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ajilon Professional Staffing LLC, FILED. Service date 12/14/2022 by CM/ECF.[3436632] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/14/2022 11:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Frequency Electronics, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3434059] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/09/2022 12:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3431529] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/06/2022 09:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, district court receipt # ANYEDC-16192728, FILED.[3431527] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/06/2022 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/14/2022, RECEIVED.[3431524] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/06/2022 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jia Deng, FILED. [3431522] [22-3074] [Entered: 12/06/2022 09:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less