This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2021 at 06:13:26 (UTC).

Demetrius Hill v. Chris Rivers

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Demetrius Hill filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Chris Rivers. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3141

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

CHRIS RIVERS

Petitioner / Appellant

DEMETRIUS HILL

Thomson, IL 61285

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Jana L. Brady

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

327 S. Church Street

Rockford, IL 61101-0000

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Demetrius Hill

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY

P.O. Box 1002

Thomson, IL 61285

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 14 day notice to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or pay the docketing fee in the District Court. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/04/2021 for Appellant Demetrius Hill [15] [7129549] [20-3141] (CG) [Entered: 12/18/2020 10:24 AM]

#14

(#14) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Chris Rivers. [14] [7126923] [20-3141] (Brady, Jana) [Entered: 12/08/2020 02:34 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER: In light of the district courts order of 12/07/2020, granting petitioner Demetrius Hills motions for reconsideration, vacating that courts dismissal order of 10/20/2020, and reopening petitioner Demetrius Hills case, both petitioner Demetrius Hill and respondent Chris Rivers file, on or before 12/22/2020, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW [7126859] [13] [7126859] [20-3141] (MM) [Entered: 12/08/2020 12:28 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed district court order dated 12/07/2020. Respondent's motions for reconsideration are granted. The Court's 10/20/2020 dismissal order and judgment are vacated and this case is reopened. Forwarded to DW. [12] [7126423] [20-3141] (CMD) [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:38 PM]

#11

(#11) Filed status report by Appellee Chris Rivers. [11] [7126202] [20-3141] (Brady, Jana) [Entered: 12/07/2020 10:04 AM]

#10

(#10) ORDER re: Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance. [ # 7 ] On 11/10/2020, this court ordered that briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. Accordingly, to the extent that the appellant seeks to suspend briefing, his request is unnecessary. To the extent that he is seeking to suspend his deadline for filing a docketing statement, the request is DENIED. The appellant shall file his overdue docketing statement by 12/16/2020. SCR [10] [7125387] [20-3141] (MM) [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:30 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed District Court order dated 12/02/2020. The Court believes the motion for reconsideration to be a routine matter allowing for the likely issuance of a ruling on the motion by no later than December 20, 2020. (See order for further details.) Forwarded to DW. [9] [7125325] [20-3141] (JR) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:16 PM]

#7

(#7) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Demetrius Hill to hold appeal in abeyance. [7] [7124754] [20-3141] (CAH) [Entered: 12/01/2020 09:35 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed status report by Appellee Chris Rivers. [6] [7124547] [20-3141] (Brady, Jana) [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:28 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER: Appellant Demetrius Hill is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Demetrius Hill by 12/02/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 1605. [5] [7122465] [20-3141] (AD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:41 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellee shall file a Status Report regarding the disposition of the petitioner-appellants Motion for Reconsideration. If the district court has not issued its ruling, counsel should inquire of the district judge when a ruling is expected. Briefing shall continue to be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). Status report due for Appellee Chris Rivers by 11/30/2020. DW. [4] [7122009] [20-3141] (ZNS) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:44 PM]

#3

(#3) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Chris Rivers. [3] [7121758] [20-3141] (Brady, Jana) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:16 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: Petitioner-appellant Demetrius Hill and respondent-appellee Chris Rivers shall file, on or before 11/24/2020, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be STAYED pending the entry of the order disposing of the motion. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). DW [2][2] [7120969] [20-3141] (MM) [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:29 PM]

1 #4

Fee Notice

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Federal Habeas Corpus Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 14 day notice to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or pay the docketing fee in the District Court. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/04/2021 for Appellant Demetrius Hill [15] [7129549] [20-3141] (CG) [Entered: 12/18/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Chris Rivers. [14] [7126923] [20-3141] (Brady, Jana) [Entered: 12/08/2020 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: In light of the district courts order of 12/07/2020, granting petitioner Demetrius Hills motions for reconsideration, vacating that courts dismissal order of 10/20/2020, and reopening petitioner Demetrius Hills case, both petitioner Demetrius Hill and respondent Chris Rivers file, on or before 12/22/2020, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW [7126859] [13] [7126859] [20-3141] (MM) [Entered: 12/08/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed district court order dated 12/07/2020. Respondent's motions for reconsideration are granted. The Court's 10/20/2020 dismissal order and judgment are vacated and this case is reopened. Forwarded to DW. [12] [7126423] [20-3141] (CMD) [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed status report by Appellee Chris Rivers. [11] [7126202] [20-3141] (Brady, Jana) [Entered: 12/07/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re: Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance. [ # 7 ] On 11/10/2020, this court ordered that briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. Accordingly, to the extent that the appellant seeks to suspend briefing, his request is unnecessary. To the extent that he is seeking to suspend his deadline for filing a docketing statement, the request is DENIED. The appellant shall file his overdue docketing statement by 12/16/2020. SCR [10] [7125387] [20-3141] (MM) [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed District Court order dated 12/02/2020. The Court believes the motion for reconsideration to be a routine matter allowing for the likely issuance of a ruling on the motion by no later than December 20, 2020. (See order for further details.) Forwarded to DW. [9] [7125325] [20-3141] (JR) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re: Status report of 11/30/2020. Counsel for Appellee Chris Rivers are ordered to file a further status report regarding the disposition of appellant's motion for reconsideration. Briefing shall continue to be SUSPENDED pending further court order. Status report due for Appellee Chris Rivers by 12/30/2020. DW [8] [7124820] [20-3141] (ER) [Entered: 12/01/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Demetrius Hill to hold appeal in abeyance. [7] [7124754] [20-3141] (CAH) [Entered: 12/01/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed status report by Appellee Chris Rivers. [6] [7124547] [20-3141] (Brady, Jana) [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Appellant Demetrius Hill is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Demetrius Hill by 12/02/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 1605. [5] [7122465] [20-3141] (AD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Appellee shall file a Status Report regarding the disposition of the petitioner-appellants Motion for Reconsideration. If the district court has not issued its ruling, counsel should inquire of the district judge when a ruling is expected. Briefing shall continue to be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). Status report due for Appellee Chris Rivers by 11/30/2020. DW. [4] [7122009] [20-3141] (ZNS) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Chris Rivers. [3] [7121758] [20-3141] (Brady, Jana) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Petitioner-appellant Demetrius Hill and respondent-appellee Chris Rivers shall file, on or before 11/24/2020, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be STAYED pending the entry of the order disposing of the motion. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). DW [2][2] [7120969] [20-3141] (MM) [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 11/16/2020. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Demetrius Hill by 11/09/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 11/16/2020 for Appellant Demetrius Hill. [1] [7119319] [20-3141] (FP) [Entered: 11/03/2020 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less