This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2019 at 06:06:21 (UTC).

Demarco Nichols, et al v. Illinois Department of Transp, et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Demarco Nichols filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Illinois Department of Transp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1252

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMARCO NICHOLS

Appellants

LONGO & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED

JOSEPH A. LONGO

Mount Prospect, IL 60056-0000

Defendant / Appellees

ILLINOIS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

ILLINOIS DEPARTMENT OF CENTRAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph A. Longo

Attorney at LONGO & ASSOCIATES

2100 W. Haven

Mount Prospect, IL 60056-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Nadine J. Wichern

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

100 W. Randolph Street, State Of Illinois Center

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Certified copy sent

Open Document #2

Mandate

17 #1

Final Order with Mandate

17 #2

Mandate

#16

(#16) Motion filed by Appellant Longo & Associates, Limited in 19-1252, 19-1456 to dismiss case. [16] [6993114] [19-1252, 19-1285, 19-1456] (Longo, Joseph) [Entered: 03/25/2019 06:19 PM]

#15

(#15) Motion filed by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1455 to dismiss case. [15] [6992769] [19-1455, 19-1252, 19-1285, 19-1456] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/24/2019 05:16 PM]

#14

(#14) ORDER: Appellants shall file, on or before 03/25/2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed as unnecessary. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). DW [6991362] [14] [6991362] [19-1252] (MM) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:23 PM]

#13

(#13) Filed District Court order dated 03/08/2019. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time regarding notice of appeal [319] is granted. Forwarded to DW. [13] [6989776] [19-1252] (JR) [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:27 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed status report by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285. [12] [6989344] [19-1285, 19-1252] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:50 AM]

#11

(#11) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285. [11] [6988201] [19-1285, 19-1252] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:53 PM]

#10

(#10) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellees Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1252. [10] [6988150] [19-1252, 19-1285] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:56 PM]

#9

(#9) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285. [9] [6988145] [19-1285, 19-1252] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:48 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER re: Jurisdictional memorandum. IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before March 1, 2019, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of February 12, 2019. DW [8] [6987224] [19-1252] (AP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:16 PM]

#7

(#7) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants Longo & Associates, Limited and Joseph A. Longo in 19-1252. [7] [6986937] [19-1252, 19-1285] (Longo, Joseph) [Entered: 02/25/2019 06:26 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER re: Appellants Motion for Clarification or Vacation of 2/12/19 Order filed February 21, 2019, which the court treats as appellants response to the courts order of February 12, 2019. IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before March 1, 2019, a response to appellants motion, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of February 12, 2019. Should appellants choose to supplement their response to the courts order of February 12, 2019, they must do so by the deadline set in that order February 25, 2019. Appellants request to extend the time to respond is DENIED as appellants give no reason why additional time beyond the original deadline is required. [6] [6986424] [19-1252] (AG) [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:21 PM]

#5

(#5) Motion filed by Appellants Joseph A. Longo and Longo & Associates, Limited in 19-1252 APPELLANTS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OR VACATION OF 2/12/19 ORDER. [5] [6986033] [19-1252, 19-1285] (Longo, Joseph) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:01 AM]

#4

(#4) Motion filed by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285 to extend time to file docketing statement. [4] [6985363] [19-1285, 19-1252]--[Edited 02/19/2019 by FP to reflect correct document name.] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:45 PM]

#3

(#3) Appearance form filed by Attorney Nadine J. Wichern for Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285. [3] [6985132] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1285, 19-1252] -[Edited 02/19/2019 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:01 AM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 03/27/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6993594-2] [6993594] [19-1252] (CAG) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER: re: Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal. This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 16 ][17][6993577] [19-1252] (CAG) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Motion filed by Appellant Longo & Associates, Limited in 19-1252, 19-1456 to dismiss case. [16] [6993114] [19-1252, 19-1285, 19-1456] (Longo, Joseph) [Entered: 03/25/2019 06:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Motion filed by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1455 to dismiss case. [15] [6992769] [19-1455, 19-1252, 19-1285, 19-1456] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/24/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: Appellants shall file, on or before 03/25/2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed as unnecessary. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). DW [6991362] [14] [6991362] [19-1252] (MM) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Filed District Court order dated 03/08/2019. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time regarding notice of appeal [319] is granted. Forwarded to DW. [13] [6989776] [19-1252] (JR) [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Filed status report by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285. [12] [6989344] [19-1285, 19-1252] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285. [11] [6988201] [19-1285, 19-1252] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/01/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellees Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1252. [10] [6988150] [19-1252, 19-1285] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285. [9] [6988145] [19-1285, 19-1252] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re: Jurisdictional memorandum. IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before March 1, 2019, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of February 12, 2019. DW [8] [6987224] [19-1252] (AP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants Longo & Associates, Limited and Joseph A. Longo in 19-1252. [7] [6986937] [19-1252, 19-1285] (Longo, Joseph) [Entered: 02/25/2019 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re: Appellants Motion for Clarification or Vacation of 2/12/19 Order filed February 21, 2019, which the court treats as appellants response to the courts order of February 12, 2019. IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before March 1, 2019, a response to appellants motion, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of February 12, 2019. Should appellants choose to supplement their response to the courts order of February 12, 2019, they must do so by the deadline set in that order February 25, 2019. Appellants request to extend the time to respond is DENIED as appellants give no reason why additional time beyond the original deadline is required. [6] [6986424] [19-1252] (AG) [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion filed by Appellants Joseph A. Longo and Longo & Associates, Limited in 19-1252 APPELLANTS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OR VACATION OF 2/12/19 ORDER. [5] [6986033] [19-1252, 19-1285] (Longo, Joseph) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion filed by Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285 to extend time to file docketing statement. [4] [6985363] [19-1285, 19-1252]--[Edited 02/19/2019 by FP to reflect correct document name.] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Appearance form filed by Attorney Nadine J. Wichern for Appellants Illinois Department of Central Management Services and Illinois Department of Transportation in 19-1285. [3] [6985132] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1285, 19-1252] -[Edited 02/19/2019 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Wichern, Nadine) [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Appellants Longo & Associates, Limited and Joseph A. Longo shall file, on or before 02/25/2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). DW [6984048] [2] [6984048] [19-1252] (MM) [Entered: 02/12/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 02/25/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/25/2019 for Joseph A. Longo and Longo & Associates, Limited. [1] [6983838] [19-1252] (FP) [Entered: 02/12/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.