This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/05/2022 at 05:17:42 (UTC).

Dell, Inc. v. Alacritech, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 Dell, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Alacritech, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2094

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

DELL, INC.

Appellee

ALACRITECH, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Kirk T. Bradley Esq.

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

101 South Tryon Street, 4000 Bank Of America Plaza

Charlotte, NC 28280

Appellee Attorney

James M. Glass

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/01/2022. [864582] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/17/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/17/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 08/17/2022. Certified List is due on 09/12/2022. [EKD] [Entered: 08/03/2022 11:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALACRITECH, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dell Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James M. Glass