This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/27/2021 at 06:06:32 (UTC).

DeLima v. Google LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 DeLima filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1161

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GOOGLE LLC

TWITTER, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

NATASHA DELIMA

Keene, NH 03431

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan Mark Eck

Attorney at Orr & Reno PA

45 S Main St, Ste 400, Po Box 3550

Concord, NH 03302-3550

Ryan Thomas Mrazik

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-0000

David A. Perez

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Natasha Delima

192 Roxbury St

Keene, NH 03431

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Google LLC and Twitter, Inc. filed by Attorney David A. Perez. Certificate of service dated 04/14/2021. [21-1161] (DAP) [Entered: 04/14/2021 05:04 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Twitter, Inc. filed by Attorney David A. Perez. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2021. [21-1161] (DAP) [Entered: 04/12/2021 05:09 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Ryan Thomas Mrazik for Twitter, Inc. and Google LLC. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 04/01/2021 09:02 AM]

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Electronic Order granting in forma pauperis status on appel entered on 3/23/2021. [21-1161] (DPO) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:49 AM]

Open Document

ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL record filed consistig of district court docket no. 50 and Text of Order entered 3/23/21: The 3/22/2021 Endorsed Order is VACATED and the motion is granted. The clerk's office shall arrange for payment for the relevant transcripts. The court apologizes for any confusion or inconvenience. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:18 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 03/30/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Ryan Thomas Mrazik for Twitter, Inc. and Google LLC. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 03/16/2021 11:52 AM]

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Natasha Delima. Transcript report/order form due 04/12/2021. [21-1161] (DPO) [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:03 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file a transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Natasha Delima. Certificate of service dated 03/03/2021. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:43 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/02/2021 for appellant Natasha Delima. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 04/23/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Brenda Kay Hancock: 01/21/2021, Motion Hearing held via video conference. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 04/23/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Brenda Kay Hancock: 11/05/2020, Chambers Conf. held via video conference. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 04/23/2021 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Google LLC and Twitter, Inc. filed by Attorney David A. Perez. Certificate of service dated 04/14/2021. [21-1161] (DAP) [Entered: 04/14/2021 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Twitter, Inc. filed by Attorney David A. Perez. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2021. [21-1161] (DAP) [Entered: 04/12/2021 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Ryan Thomas Mrazik for Twitter, Inc. and Google LLC. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 04/01/2021 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Electronic Order granting in forma pauperis status on appel entered on 3/23/2021. [21-1161] (DPO) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL record filed consistig of district court docket no. 50 and Text of Order entered 3/23/21: The 3/22/2021 Endorsed Order is VACATED and the motion is granted. The clerk's office shall arrange for payment for the relevant transcripts. The court apologizes for any confusion or inconvenience. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 03/30/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Ryan Thomas Mrazik for Twitter, Inc. and Google LLC. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 03/16/2021 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Natasha Delima. Transcript report/order form due 04/12/2021. [21-1161] (DPO) [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file a transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Natasha Delima. Certificate of service dated 03/03/2021. [21-1161] (CMP) [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #42) filed by Appellant Natasha Delima. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/12/2021. [21-1161] (JMK) [Entered: 02/26/2021 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWITTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant