This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:01:41 (UTC).

Delbert E. Marshall v. USA

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Delbert E Marshall filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1039

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

DELBERT E. MARSHALL

Greenville, IL 62246

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Delbert E. Marshall

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 5000

Greenville, IL 62246

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Greggory R. Walters

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

211 Fulton Street, One Technology Plaza

Peoria, IL 61602-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

2255/Appealability Denied Case

1 #3

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Delbert E. Marshall. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 15-1550, 18-2678. [5] [6986216] [19-1039] (FP) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:34 PM]

1 #2

Fee Notice

1 #4

Notice to District Court

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellant Delbert E. Marshall is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Delbert E. Marshall by 02/25/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0595. JR [4] [6983527] [19-1039] (MM) [Entered: 02/11/2019 12:50 PM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall proceed to a determination of appellants fee status on appeal, and to a determination of whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Briefing in this consolidated appeal is SUSPENDED until further court order. DW [2] [6980010] [19-1039, 19-1156] (VG) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:41 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Delbert E. Marshall leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 01/29/2019. [3] [6980886] [19-1039, 19-1156] (AP) [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:21 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Delbert E. Marshall. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 15-1550, 18-2678. [5] [6986216] [19-1039] (FP) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Appellant Delbert E. Marshall is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Delbert E. Marshall by 02/25/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0595. JR [4] [6983527] [19-1039] (MM) [Entered: 02/11/2019 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Delbert E. Marshall leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 01/29/2019. [3] [6980886] [19-1039, 19-1156] (AP) [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall proceed to a determination of appellants fee status on appeal, and to a determination of whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Briefing in this consolidated appeal is SUSPENDED until further court order. DW [2] [6980010] [19-1039, 19-1156] (VG) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Federal prisoner's 2255 case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 01/04/2019. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 01/18/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/18/2019 for Appellant Delbert E. Marshall. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Delbert E. Marshall by 01/11/2019 [1] [6975932] [19-1039] (VG) [Entered: 01/07/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.