This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2020 at 07:32:06 (UTC).

Deherrera v. Commissioner, SSA

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 Deherrera filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, SSA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1189

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER, SSA

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARIE DIANE DEHERRERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Noah Schabacker

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

J. Benedict Garcia

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Joseph Anthony Whitcomb

Attorney at Whitcomb, Selinsky

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Tower One, Suite 9500

Denver, CO 80222

Brandon Michael Selinsky

Attorney at Whitcomb, Selinsky

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Tower One, Suite 9500

Denver, CO 80222

Sarah J.W. Wilkonson

Attorney at Rocky Mountain Disability Law Group

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80220

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #5

Appendix VOL 5

Open Restricted Document #4

Appendix VOL 4

Open Restricted Document #3

Appendix VOL 3

Open Restricted Document #2

Appendix VOL 2

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Restricted Document #1

prelim roa

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket[10755210] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellant is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments and number of volumes filed for appendices. Appellee's brief now due 08/13/2020 for Commissioner, SSA. Paper copies of appellant's brief and appendix due 07/22/2020 by Marie Diane Deherrera. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1189] [Entered: 07/15/2020 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10755163] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera. Served on 07/14/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1189] SJW [Entered: 07/14/2020 09:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10755162] Appellant's appendix filed by Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera. Total number of volumes filed:. Served on 07/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1189] SJW [Entered: 07/14/2020 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10755002] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 08/13/2020 for Sarah J.W. Wilkonson. [20-1189] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10754725] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Sarah J.W. Wilkonson for Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/13/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1189] [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket[10754723] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah J.W. Wilkonson for Appellant Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1189]--[Edited 07/13/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 7/13/2020] SJW [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket[10746340] Notice of clerical error - the deficiency notice regarding fees issued 6/8/20 was issued in error. A motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis was filed on 6/3/20. [20-1189] [Entered: 06/09/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745940] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: fee not paid. Fee is due by 06/11/2020 for Marie Diane Deherrera [20-1189] [Edited to reflect that a motion for IFP was filed on 6/3/20-- Edited 06/09/2020 by NA] [Entered: 06/08/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket[10745277] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/04/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/14/2020 for Marie Diane Deherrera. [20-1189] [Entered: 06/05/2020 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745190] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Noah Schabacker for Commissioner, SSA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (One of the parties listed is or was counsel of record). Served on 06/04/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1189] [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket[10745186] Entry of appearance submitted by Noah Schabacker for Appellee Commissioner, SSA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/04/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1189] --[Edited 06/04/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 6/4/2020.] NS [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10744741] Motion filed by Appellant Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.. Served on: 06/03/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1189] JAW [Entered: 06/03/2020 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10744554] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Brandon Michael Selinsky and Mr. Joseph Anthony Whitcomb for Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1189] [Entered: 06/02/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket[10744548] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/09/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1189] [Entered: 06/02/2020 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10744545] Notice that a transcript is not necessary filed by Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera. Served on: 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1189]--[Edited 06/02/2020 by LG to correct event code]--[Edited 06/03/2020 by LG] JAW [Entered: 06/02/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket[10744544] Entry of appearance submitted by Brandon Selinksy, Joseph Whitcomb for Appellant Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/02/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1189] JAW [Entered: 06/02/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10744541] Docketing statement filed by Ms. Marie Diane Deherrera. Served on 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1189] JAW [Entered: 06/02/2020 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10742147] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/22/2020 Fee is due by 06/05/2020 (IFP pending in the District Court) for Marie Diane Deherrera. Docketing statement due 06/05/2020 for Marie Diane Deherrera. Transcript order form due 06/05/2020 for Marie Diane Deherrera. Notice of appearance due on 06/05/2020 for Commissioner, SSA and Marie Diane Deherrera. [20-1189] [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Anthony Whitcomb