This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 06:00:21 (UTC).

Dehaney v. Chagnon

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Dehaney filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Chagnon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-474

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Amy Chagnon, State School Teacher

Maria Pirro Simmons, State School Principal

Plaintiff / Appellant

Errol Dehaney

Suffield, CT 06080

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Thomas J. Davis

Attorney at Connecticut Office of the Attorney General

110 Sherman Street

Hartford, CT 06105

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Errol Dehaney

Attorney at Garner Correctional Institution

1153 East Street, South

Suffield, CT 06080

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) LETTER, dated 04/12/2019, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, Alerting the court that the papers to cured the defective document have already been sent, RECEIVED. Service date 04/01/2019 by US mail.[2543382] [19-474] [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:10 PM]

#16

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to withdraw appeal, [15], on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, copy to pro se, FILED.[2535132] [19-474] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:03 PM]

#18

(#18) MOTION, to withdraw appeal, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, FILED. Service date 04/01/2019 by US mail.[2535519] [19-474] [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:48 AM]

#17

(#17) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, FILED. Service date 03/29/2019 by US mail.[2535138] [19-474] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:06 PM]

#14

(#14) CAPTION, party rearrangement, AMENDED.[2531597] [19-474] [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:25 AM]

#13

(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to withdraw appeal, [12], on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, copy to pro se, FILED.[2531592] [19-474] [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:22 AM]

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Errol Dehaney, FILED. Service date 03/22/2019 by US mail.[2531585] [19-474] [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:20 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 03/15/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/05/2019, unless Appellant Errol Dehaney submits, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2518940] [19-474] [Entered: 03/15/2019 01:18 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER, dated 03/15/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/05/2019, unless Appellant Errol Dehaney submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2518933] [19-474] [Entered: 03/15/2019 01:12 PM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Amy Chagnon and Maria Pirro Simmons, FILED. Service date 03/14/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2518158] [19-474] [Entered: 03/14/2019 12:22 PM]

#6

(#6) NOTICE, to Appellee Amy Chagnon and Maria Pirro Simmons , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2515590] [19-474] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:21 AM]

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2504799] [19-474] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:41 PM]

#4

(#4) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2504793] [19-474] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:39 PM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2504777] [19-474] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:35 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) LETTER, dated 04/12/2019, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, Alerting the court that the papers to cured the defective document have already been sent, RECEIVED. Service date 04/01/2019 by US mail.[2543382] [19-474] [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEAL [ # 18 ],[ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, FILED.[2535523] [19-474] [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to withdraw appeal, [15], on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, copy to pro se, FILED.[2535132] [19-474] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION, to withdraw appeal, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, FILED. Service date 04/01/2019 by US mail.[2535519] [19-474] [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, FILED. Service date 03/29/2019 by US mail.[2535138] [19-474] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • (#15) MOTION, to withdraw appeal, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, FILED. No Service.[2535127] [19-474] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CAPTION, party rearrangement, AMENDED.[2531597] [19-474] [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to withdraw appeal, [12], on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, copy to pro se, FILED.[2531592] [19-474] [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • (#12) MOTION, to withdraw appeal, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, FILED. No Service.[2531589] [19-474] [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Errol Dehaney, FILED. Service date 03/22/2019 by US mail.[2531585] [19-474] [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER, dated 03/20/2019, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, Advising the Court of his new address , RECEIVED. Service date 03/29/2019 by US mail.[2529057] [19-474] [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, dated 03/15/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/05/2019, unless Appellant Errol Dehaney submits, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2518940] [19-474] [Entered: 03/15/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, dated 03/15/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/05/2019, unless Appellant Errol Dehaney submits, Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2518933] [19-474] [Entered: 03/15/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Amy Chagnon and Maria Pirro Simmons, FILED. Service date 03/14/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2518158] [19-474] [Entered: 03/14/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE, to Appellee Amy Chagnon and Maria Pirro Simmons , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2515590] [19-474] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2504799] [19-474] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2504793] [19-474] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2504781] [19-474] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2504777] [19-474] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Errol Dehaney, FILED. [2504772] [19-474] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.