This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/03/2021 at 06:09:31 (UTC).

Dees v. Dobson Technologies, et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Dees filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Dobson Technologies. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-6013

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SARWAT ELLEDGE

DOBSON TECHNOLOGIES

TRENT LEFORCE

PATRICK CALLOWAY

Plaintiff / Appellant

TOMMY J. DEES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alyssa N. Lankford

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 North Robinson, Eighth Floor, Two Leadership Square

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Paul Aaron Ross

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 North Robinson, Eighth Floor, Two Leadership Square

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Patricia A. Podolec

Attorney at Patricia A Podolec, Attorney at Law

10601 South Western, Suite 119

Moore, OK 73170

Rachel Bussett

Attorney at Bussett Legal Group

2201 North Classen Boulevard

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Kindra Avila

Attorney at Bussett Legal Group

2201 North Classen Boulevard

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

Open Document #2

Transmittal letter

Open Document #3

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10819730] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's opening brief and appendix to 04/09/2021 for Tommy J. Dees [21-6013] [Entered: 04/02/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docket[10818725] Attorney Alyssa N. Lankford for Dobson Technologies, Patrick Calloway, Trent LeForce and Sarwat Elledge admitted to the bar of this court. [21-6013] [Entered: 03/30/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817624] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 04/05/2021. [21-6013] [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10809235] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 02/19/2021. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/31/2021 for Tommy J. Dees [21-6013] [Entered: 02/22/2021 08:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808637] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2021 for Alyssa N. Lankford. [21-6013] [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808240] Entry of appearance filed by Alyssa N. Lankford for Dobson Technologies, Patrick Calloway, Trent LeForce and Sarwat Elledge. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (Previously disclosed.) Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-6013] [Entered: 02/17/2021 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket[10808234] Entry of appearance submitted by Alyssa N. Lankford for Appellees Patrick Calloway, Dobson Technologies, Sarwat Elledge and Trent LeForce for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6013]--[Edited 02/17/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/17/21] ANL [Entered: 02/17/2021 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808161] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Paul Aaron Ross for Dobson Technologies, Patrick Calloway, Trent LeForce and Sarwat Elledge. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-6013] [Entered: 02/17/2021 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket[10808123] Entry of appearance submitted by Paul A. Ross for Appellees Patrick Calloway, Dobson Technologies, Sarwat Elledge and Trent LeForce for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/17/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 02/17/21][21-6013] PAR [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808067] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 02/25/2021 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-6013] [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket[10807543] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 02/19/2021 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-6013] [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807474] Entry of appearance filed by Rachel Bussett for Tommy J. Dees. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6013] [Entered: 02/12/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807472] Entry of appearance filed by Kindra Avila for Tommy J. Dees. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-6013] [Entered: 02/12/2021 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket[10807462] Entry of appearance submitted by Rachel Bussett for Appellant Tommy J. Dees for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [21-6013] --[Edited 02/12/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] RB [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807461] Docketing statement filed by Tommy J. Dees. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [21-6013] KA [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807460] Notice received from Tommy J. Dees that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail [21-6013] KA [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket[10807448] Entry of appearance submitted by Kindra Avila for Appellant Tommy J. Dees for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [21-6013] --[Edited 02/12/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] KA [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10804601] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/02/2021 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 02/16/2021 for Tommy J. Dees. Notice of appearance also due on 02/16/2021 for Patrick Calloway, Dobson Technologies, Sarwat Elledge and Trent LeForce [21-6013] [Entered: 02/02/2021 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia A Podolec

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel L Bussett