This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/09/2022 at 06:12:08 (UTC).

Debra Powell v. Colton Rasmussen, et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 Debra Powell filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Colton Rasmussen. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-35362

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendants

JOHN DENNIS RASMUSSEN, an individual

IAN RASMUSSEN, an individual

TERRA-MAGIC, INC., an Oregon corporation; Nominal Defendant

TERRA-MAGIC SEEDS, LTD., an Oregon corporation; Nominal Defendant

Plaintiff / Appellee

DEBRA POWELL, an individual

Defendant / Appellants

COLTON RASMUSSEN, an individual

HEIDI RASMUSSEN, an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Peter Grabiel

Attorney at Pitzer Law

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Jeff Pitzer

Attorney at Pitzer Law

210 Sw Morrison Street, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Michael Andrew Cox

Attorney at Law Office of Michael A. Cox

12360 Sw Chandler Drive

Tigard, OR 97224

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/29/2022, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12457646] [22-35361, 22-35362] (CL) [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:13 PM]

#6

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/06/2022, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/29/2022). [12462532] [22-35361, 22-35362] (CL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:26 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Colton Rasmussen and Heidi Rasmussen Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/17/2022. [12448726] [22-35362] (Cox, Michael) [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:14 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Peter Grabiel for party(s) Appellee Debra Powell. [12467211] (RL) [Entered: 06/09/2022 09:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Peter Matthew Grabiel (Pitzer Law, 210 SW Morrison St., Ste. 600, Portland, OR 97204) for Appellee Debra Powell. Date of service: 06/09/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12467204] [22-35362] (Grabiel, Peter) [Entered: 06/09/2022 09:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/06/2022, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/29/2022). [12462532] [22-35361, 22-35362] (CL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/29/2022, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12457646] [22-35361, 22-35362] (CL) [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/17/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12448969]. [22-35362] (AD) [Entered: 05/17/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Colton Rasmussen and Heidi Rasmussen Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/17/2022. [12448726] [22-35362] (Cox, Michael) [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Colton Rasmussen and Heidi Rasmussen Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/17/2022. Transcript ordered by 06/10/2022. Transcript due 07/11/2022. Appellants Colton Rasmussen and Heidi Rasmussen opening brief due 08/15/2022. Appellee Debra Powell answering brief due 09/15/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12443066] (RT) [Entered: 05/10/2022 02:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Cox