This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:57 (UTC).

DeBarros v. From You Flower, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 DeBarros filed an Other lawsuit against From You Flower, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1713

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ELSON M. DEBARROS

Pawtucket, RI 02860

Defendant / Appellees

ROBYN FONTAIN

FROM YOU FLOWER, LLC

DELIVERY COMPANY CAMBRIDGE, MASSACHUSETTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Elson M. DeBarros

30 Howard Ave

Cranston, RI 02920

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sean K. Brousseau

Attorney at Hodosh Spinella & Angelone PC

One Turks Head Place, Ste 810

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Thomas C. Angelone

Attorney at Hodosh Spinella & Angelone PC

1 Turks Head Pl, Ste 810

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Sean Kevin Brousseau

Attorney at Hodosh Spinella & Angelone PC

1 Turks Head Pl, Ste 810

Providence, RI 02903-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Elson M. DeBarros indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1713] (CP) [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:26 AM]

Open Document

ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 08/26/2019. [19-1713] (CP) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:07 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 08/23/2019. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [19-1713] (CP) [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:55 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Elson M. DeBarros indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1713] (CP) [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 08/26/2019. [19-1713] (CP) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 08/23/2019. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [19-1713] (CP) [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #46) filed by Appellant Elson M. DeBarros. Transcript Report/Order form due 07/30/2019. [19-1713] (CP) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.