This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/29/2022 at 01:51:07 (UTC).

Deanna Scarbo v. Wisdom Financial, et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Deanna Scarbo filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wisdom Financial,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1398

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Defendants

WISDOM FINANCIAL, doing business as East Coast Funding Group Inc

TRANSUNION

EXPERIAN

EQUIFAX

CREDIT ONE BANK NA

MAJOR FINANCIAL CORP

CAPITAL BANK

Plaintiff / Appellant

DEANNA SCARBO

Rosemont, PA 19010

Defendant / Appellees

LVNV FUNDING LLC, doing business as Resurgent Capital Services

GREAT LAKES EDUCATIONAL LOAN SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Graeme E. Hogan Esq.

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck

1600 John F. Kennedy Bouevard, Four Penn Center

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Monica M. Littman Esq.

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck

1600 John F. Kennedy Bouevard, Four Penn Center

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Richard J. Perr Esq.

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck

1600 John F. Kennedy Bouevard, Four Penn Center

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Casey B. Green Esq.

Attorney at Sidkoff Pincus & Green

1101 Market Street, Suite 2700

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Camille R. Nicodemus Esq.

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Robert J. Schuckit Esq.

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin Esq.

Attorney at Margolis Edelstein

170 South Independence Mall West, The Curtis Center, Suite 400E

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Jakob F. Williams Esq.

Attorney at Clark Hill

2001 Market Street, Two Commerce Square, Suite 2620

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jonathan M. Marmo Esq.

Attorney at Holland & Knight

2929 Arch Street, Suite 800

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Erin P. Loucks Esq.

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon

2001 Market Street, Two Commerce Square, Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

D. Alexander Barnes Esq.

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel

1500 Market Street, Centre Square West, 34Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Deanna Scarbo

922 Montgomery Avenue

Rosemont, PA 19010

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lauren M. Burnette Esq.

Attorney at Messer Strickler Burnette

12276 San Jose Boulevard, Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Corinne S. Brennan Esq.

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Gregory R. Sellers Esq.

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) PRO SE REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Deanna Scarbo. Pages: 6. Certificate of Service dated 08/18/2022 by US mail. (KEL) [Entered: 08/22/2022 03:19 PM]

#26

(#26) ORDER (Clerk) granting Joint Motion by Appellees LVNV Funding LLC and Great Lakes Educational Loan Services Inc. for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix with fiing as of July 28, 2022. (MS) [Entered: 08/01/2022 10:16 AM]

#25

(#25) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee LVNV Funding LLC. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2022 by ECF, 3rd party. [22-1398] (LMB) [Entered: 07/29/2022 12:37 PM]

#24

(#24) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Great Lakes Educational Loan Services Inc. Certificate of Service dated 07/28/2022 by US mail, ECF, Email. [22-1398] (CSB) [Entered: 07/28/2022 01:59 PM]

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

20 #3

Briefing Info for Pro Se Litigants

20 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

20 #1

Standing Order

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) PRO SE REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Deanna Scarbo. Pages: 6. Certificate of Service dated 08/18/2022 by US mail. (KEL) [Entered: 08/22/2022 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket(#32) COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Corrected hard copies of brief received from Appellee LVNV Funding LLC. Received on 08/08/2022. (EMA) [Entered: 08/11/2022 08:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Docket(#31) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee LVNV Funding LLC - CORRECTED Brief. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 08/08/2022 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docket(#30) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Lauren M. Burnette, Esq. for Appellee LVNV Funding LLC to submit seven (7) hard copies of corrected, single sided brief. Double sided briefs are not prmitted. Due on or before 08/08/2022. (MS) [Entered: 08/04/2022 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docket(#29) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee LVNV Funding LLC - Brief (Double sided pagination) . Copies: 7. Received: 8. - NONCOMPLIANT--[Edited 08/04/2022 by MS] (KEL) [Entered: 08/04/2022 01:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Docket(#28) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees Great Lakes Educational Loan Services Inc and LVNV Funding LLC - Supplemental Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 1 (MS) [Entered: 08/01/2022 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Docket(#27) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Great Lakes Educational Loan Services Inc - Brief. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 08/01/2022 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER (Clerk) granting Joint Motion by Appellees LVNV Funding LLC and Great Lakes Educational Loan Services Inc. for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix with fiing as of July 28, 2022. (MS) [Entered: 08/01/2022 10:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee LVNV Funding LLC. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2022 by ECF, 3rd party. [22-1398] (LMB) [Entered: 07/29/2022 12:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Great Lakes Educational Loan Services Inc. Certificate of Service dated 07/28/2022 by US mail, ECF, Email. [22-1398] (CSB) [Entered: 07/28/2022 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FOLLOW UP LETTER to D. Alexander Barnes, Esq. for Capital Bank, Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin, Esq. for Experian, Casey B. Green, Esq. for TransUnion, Graeme E. Hogan, Esq. for Wisdom Financial, Monica M. Littman, Esq. for Wisdom Financial, Erin P. Loucks, Esq. for Major Financial Corp, Jonathan M. Marmo, Esq. for Credit One Bank NA, Richard J. Perr, Esq. for Wisdom Financial, Robert J. Schuckit, Esq. for TransUnion and Jakob F. Williams, Esq. for Equifax requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/25/2022. (PDB) [Entered: 04/11/2022 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee LVNV Funding LLC. [22-1398] (LMB) [Entered: 04/08/2022 04:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren Marshall Burnette on behalf of Appellee(s) LVNV Funding, LLC. [22-1398] (LMB) [Entered: 04/08/2022 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Deanna Scarbo to Notice of Jurisdictional Defect. Certificate of Service dated 04/06/2022. Service made by US mail. (PDB) [Entered: 04/08/2022 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (SH) [Entered: 03/17/2022 01:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gregory R. Sellers, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc... [22-1398] (GRS) [Entered: 03/16/2022 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Corinne Samler Brennan, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc.. [22-1398] (CSB) [Entered: 03/15/2022 04:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Great Lakes Educational Loan Services Inc. [22-1398] (CSB) [Entered: 03/15/2022 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Deanna Scarbo in District Court No. 2-20-cv-05355. (PDB) [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAJR FINANCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUIFAX INC. is a litigant