This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:00:34 (UTC).

De la Cruz-Candela, et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 De la Cruz-Candela filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JetBlue Airways Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2139

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JET BLUE AIRLINES

PRIME FLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellants

LILA PEGUERO-DE LA CRUZ

CLAUDIA DE LA CRUZ-CANDELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Margarita Rosado-Toledo

Attorney at Colon & Colon PSC

Po Box 9023355

San Juan, PR 00902-3355

Sarika J. Angulo-Velazquez

Attorney at Adsuar Muniz Goyco Seda PSC

208 Ave. Ponce De Leon, Ste 1600

San Juan, PR 00918

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer

Attorney at Rivera-Mercado & Rivera-Cordero

Po Box 192376

San Juan, PR 00919-2376

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. Brief and Appendix due 01/16/2020 for appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. [19-2139] (GB) [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:14 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. Certificate of service dated 12/30/2019. [19-2139] (JAR) [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:41 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Jet Blue Airlines and Prime Flight Aviation Services, Inc. filed by Attorney Margarita Rosado-Toledo. Certificate of service dated 12/17/2019. [19-2139] (MR) [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2019. [19-2139] (JAR) [Entered: 11/25/2019 07:19 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Lila Peguero-De la Cruz and Claudia De la Cruz-Candela filed by Attorney Javier A Rivera-Vaquer. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2019. [19-2139] (JAR) [Entered: 11/25/2019 07:18 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. Brief and Appendix due 01/16/2020 for appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. [19-2139] (GB) [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. Certificate of service dated 12/30/2019. [19-2139] (JAR) [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Jet Blue Airlines and Prime Flight Aviation Services, Inc. filed by Attorney Margarita Rosado-Toledo. Certificate of service dated 12/17/2019. [19-2139] (MR) [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/06/2020 for appellant Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-2139] (KPC) [Entered: 11/26/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2019. [19-2139] (JAR) [Entered: 11/25/2019 07:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Lila Peguero-De la Cruz and Claudia De la Cruz-Candela filed by Attorney Javier A Rivera-Vaquer. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2019. [19-2139] (JAR) [Entered: 11/25/2019 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #106) filed by Appellants Claudia De la Cruz-Candela and Lila Peguero-De la Cruz. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 11/26/2019. [19-2139] (KPC) [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.