This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/16/2023 at 06:12:00 (UTC).

D.B., et al v. County of Los Angeles, et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 D B , filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Los Angeles,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-56065

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

D.B.

D.C.B., by and through their Guardian Ad Litem, Terri Thomas, and as successors in interest to the ESTATE OF DARREN BURLEY

Defendant / Appellees

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DAVID AVILES, Deputy

DOES, 1-10, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jamon R. Hicks

Attorney at Douglas Hicks Law

5120 W Goldleaf Circle, Suite 140

Los Angeles, CA 90056

Paul L. Hoffman

Attorney at Schonbrun Seplow Harris Hoffman & Zeldes, LLP

200 Pier Avenue, Suite 226

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Michael Seplow

Attorney at Schonbrun Seplow Harris Hoffman & Zeldes LLP

9415 Culver Boulevard, Suite 115

Culver City, CA 90232

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John J. Stumreiter

Attorney at Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont

500 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jill Williams Esquire

Attorney at Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont

500 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12612002] (BLS) [Entered: 12/15/2022 07:55 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants D.B. and D.C.B. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/19/2022. [12614244] [22-56065] (Seplow, Michael) [Entered: 12/19/2022 03:33 PM]

#11

(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellants D.B. and D.C.B. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 03/20/2023. Date of service: 01/10/2023. [12627783] [22-56065] (Seplow, Michael) [Entered: 01/10/2023 06:57 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): (ECF Filing) filed by Appellants D.B. and D.C.B.; Granting Motion [ # 11 ] (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants D.B. and D.C.B.. Appellants D.B. and D.C.B. opening brief due 03/20/2023. Appellees David Aviles, County of Los Angeles and Does answering brief due 04/19/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12629090] (LKK) [Entered: 01/12/2023 09:44 AM]

#13

(#13) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 01/23/2023, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12630631] (VS) [Entered: 01/13/2023 03:58 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 01/23/2023, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12630631] (VS) [Entered: 01/13/2023 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): (ECF Filing) filed by Appellants D.B. and D.C.B.; Granting Motion [ # 11 ] (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants D.B. and D.C.B.. Appellants D.B. and D.C.B. opening brief due 03/20/2023. Appellees David Aviles, County of Los Angeles and Does answering brief due 04/19/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12629090] (LKK) [Entered: 01/12/2023 09:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellants D.B. and D.C.B. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 03/20/2023. Date of service: 01/10/2023. [12627783] [22-56065] (Seplow, Michael) [Entered: 01/10/2023 06:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Paul L. Hoffman for party(s) Appellant D.C.B. Appellant D.B.. [12626262] (RL) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Paul Lindsey Hoffman (Civil Rights Litigation Clinic UC Irvine School of Law P.O. Box 5479 Irvine, California 92616-5479 Tel. (310) 717-7373 Fax. (310) 399-7040) for Appellants D.B. and D.C.B.. Date of service: 01/09/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12626252] [22-56065] (Hoffman, Paul) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/19/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12614448]. [22-56065] (AD) [Entered: 12/19/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants D.B. and D.C.B. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/19/2022. [12614244] [22-56065] (Seplow, Michael) [Entered: 12/19/2022 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12612002] (BLS) [Entered: 12/15/2022 07:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Michael Seplow for party(s) Appellant D.C.B. Appellant D.B.. [12600973] (RL) [Entered: 12/02/2022 12:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael D. Seplow (Schonbrun Seplow Harris Hoffman & Zeldes, LLP; 9415 Culver Boulevard, #115, Culver City, CA 90232) for Appellants D.B. and D.C.B.. Date of service: 12/02/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12600970] [22-56065] (Seplow, Michael) [Entered: 12/02/2022 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Jill Williams for party(s) Appellee David Aviles Appellee County of Los Angeles. [12590391] (RL) [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jill Williams (Carpenter, Rothans & Dumont) for Appellees David Aviles and County of Los Angeles. Date of service: 11/17/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12590368] [22-56065] (Williams, Jill) [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants D.B. and D.C.B. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/25/2022. Appellants D.B. and D.C.B. opening brief due 01/17/2023. Appellees David Aviles, County of Los Angeles and Does answering brief due 02/16/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12590202] (JBS) [Entered: 11/17/2022 01:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less