This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/07/2022 at 06:10:25 (UTC).

Dawn Kennedy v. City of Philadelphia

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Dawn Kennedy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Philadelphia. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1413

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DAWN KENNEDY

Defendant / Appellee

CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, d/b/a Philadelphia Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Gary Schafkopf Esq.

Attorney at Hopkins & Schafkopf

11 Bala Avenue

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.

Attorney at Weisberg Law

7 South Morton Avenue

Morton, PA 19070

David A. Berlin Esq.

Attorney at Weisberg Law

7 South Morton Avenue

Morton, PA 19070

Brian R. Mildenberg Esq.

Attorney at Mildenberg & Stalbaum

123 South Broad Street, Suite 1610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer MacNaughton Esq.

Attorney at City of Philadelphia

1515 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Frank E. Wehr Esq. II

Attorney at City of Philadelphia

1515 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Kia Ghee Esq.

Attorney at City of Philadelphia

1515 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Court Order

1 #3

District Court Memorandum

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Standing Order

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

#3

(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to David A. Berlin, Esq., Brian R. Mildenberg, Esq., Gary Schafkopf, Esq., Matthew B. Weisberg, Esq., Tiffany R. Allen, Esq., Kia Ghee, Esq., Frank E. Wehr, II, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 03/22/2022. (SB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 11:10 AM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jennifer MacNaughton on behalf of Appellee(s) City of Philadelphia. [22-1413] (JM) [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:21 PM]

#6

(#6) FOLLOW UP LETTER to David A. Berlin, Esq. for Dawn Kennedy, Brian R. Mildenberg, Esq. for Dawn Kennedy, Gary Schafkopf, Esq. for Dawn Kennedy and Matthew B. Weisberg, Esq. for Dawn Kennedy requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/05/2022. Information Statement on or before 04/05/2022. Concise Summary on or before 04/05/2022. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/05/2022. (SB) [Entered: 03/22/2022 08:24 AM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew B. Weisberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Dawn Kennedy. [22-1413] (MBW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:38 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Dawn Kennedy. [22-1413] (MBW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:39 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Dawn Kennedy. [22-1413] (MBW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:39 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Dawn Kennedy advising this court that. Requested date(s) are: 02/24/2022, to be filed by [22-1413] (MBW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:40 PM]

11 #1

Transcript Scheduling Order Issued

11 #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by SUZANNE WHITE,OCR. for date(s) of 2/24/2022. [22-1413] (JMG) [Entered: 04/27/2022 03:29 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by SUZANNE WHITE,OCR. for date(s) of 2/24/2022. [22-1413] (JMG) [Entered: 04/27/2022 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER to Court Reporter Mike Finney directing transcripts, ordered on 03/23/2022 , to be filed by 04/25/2022. (SB) [Entered: 03/23/2022 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Dawn Kennedy advising this court that. Requested date(s) are: 02/24/2022, to be filed by [22-1413] (MBW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Dawn Kennedy. [22-1413] (MBW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Dawn Kennedy. [22-1413] (MBW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew B. Weisberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Dawn Kennedy. [22-1413] (MBW) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FOLLOW UP LETTER to David A. Berlin, Esq. for Dawn Kennedy, Brian R. Mildenberg, Esq. for Dawn Kennedy, Gary Schafkopf, Esq. for Dawn Kennedy and Matthew B. Weisberg, Esq. for Dawn Kennedy requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/05/2022. Information Statement on or before 04/05/2022. Concise Summary on or before 04/05/2022. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/05/2022. (SB) [Entered: 03/22/2022 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket(#5) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 03/10/2022. (SB) [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jennifer MacNaughton on behalf of Appellee(s) City of Philadelphia. [22-1413] (JM) [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to David A. Berlin, Esq., Brian R. Mildenberg, Esq., Gary Schafkopf, Esq., Matthew B. Weisberg, Esq., Tiffany R. Allen, Esq., Kia Ghee, Esq., Frank E. Wehr, II, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 03/22/2022. (SB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Dawn Kennedy in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00395. (SB) [Entered: 03/08/2022 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK E. WEHR, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER E. MACNAUGHTON(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kia Ghee Esq.