This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 06:09:05 (UTC).

Davidson v. Desai

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Davidson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Desai. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-280

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Robert Guzman

Anne Rabideau, R.N.

Deborah Bartlett-Bigg, R.N.

Katherine Frawley, R.N.

Glenn Goord

Wexford Health Services, (or whatever other corporation name they are known by) and their officers and executives

Lester Wright, M.D.

Marijon Hopkins, R.N.

Nancy O'Connell, R.N.

Thomas Eagen

Sheryl Graubard

Marshall Trabout, M.D.

Defendant / Appellees

Dana M. Smith

Heman K. Fowler, N.P.

Cheng Yin, M.D.

Welsey Canfield, M.D. present facility health services director at Elmira C.F.

Uday K. Desai, M.D.

Floyd Bennett

Calvin West

Plaintiff / Appellant

Ronald Davidson

Bronx, NY 10457

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Barbara D. Underwood

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ronald Davidson

Attorney at The Fortune Society

411 East 178Th Street Apt. 603

Bronx, NY 10457

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/09/2019, RECEIVED.[2487407] [19-280] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:15 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#16

(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Ronald Davidson, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517825] [19-280] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:14 AM]

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#7

(#7) ORDER, dated 02/11/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/04/2019,unless Appellant Ronald Davidson,submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2493744] [19-280] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:54 AM]

#14

(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [13], on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2505535] [19-280] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:17 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2487399] [19-280] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:11 PM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE, to Appellee Floyd Bennett, Welsey Canfield, Uday K. Desai, Heman K. Fowler, Dana M. Smith, Calvin West and Cheng Yin , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2500223] [19-280] [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:59 AM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2487448] [19-280] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:36 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 02/20/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/13/2019,unless Appellant Ronald Davidson,submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2500232] [19-280] [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:04 AM]

#18

(#18) MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517839] [19-280] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:20 AM]

#19

(#19) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail, fax.[2517845] [19-280] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:23 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • (#28) SEALED Record on Appeal of originating court or agency, FILED. Volume(s): 1 of 1, (Document 112 only).[2524451] [19-280] [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • (#22) ADDRESS CHANGE REQUEST, dated 03/01/2019 COMPLETED.[2517901] [19-280] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT:ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [ # 14 ], [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, FILED.[2517827] [19-280] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail, fax.[2517845] [19-280] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517839] [19-280] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Ronald Davidson, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517825] [19-280] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • (#15) ADDRESS CHANGE REQUEST, dated 02/26/2019, COMPLETED.[2505538] [19-280] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [13], on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2505535] [19-280] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, FILED. Service date 02/15/2019 by US mail.[2505519] [19-280] [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, dated 02/20/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/13/2019,unless Appellant Ronald Davidson,submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2500232] [19-280] [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE, to Appellee Floyd Bennett, Welsey Canfield, Uday K. Desai, Heman K. Fowler, Dana M. Smith, Calvin West and Cheng Yin , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2500223] [19-280] [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER, dated 02/11/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/04/2019,unless Appellant Ronald Davidson,submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2493744] [19-280] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2487448] [19-280] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2487441] [19-280] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/09/2019, RECEIVED.[2487407] [19-280] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2487399] [19-280] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Davidson, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2487384] [19-280] [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.